AK HB24 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - REPORT RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-01-18 - REPORT RECEIVED
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Regulatory Commission of Alaska; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Extend Regulatory Comm. Of Alaska Sunset
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-18 | REPORT RECEIVED | |
2011-06-24 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/9/11 | |
2011-06-24 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/8 CHAPTER 2 FSSLA 11 | |
2011-06-24 | 3:38 PM 5/25/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2011-04-21 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-21 | CC RPT ADPTD Y18 N- E2 CCS HB 24 | |
2011-04-21 | CC REPORT READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2011-04-21 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 A2 | |
2011-04-21 | CC RPT ADPTD Y24 N14 A2 CCS HB 24 | |
2011-04-21 | FN4: (CED) | |
2011-04-21 | CC REPORT: CCS HB 24 | |
2011-04-20 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2011-04-20 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2011-04-19 | THOMAS (CHAIR), PASKVAN, FRENCH | |
2011-04-19 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2011-04-19 | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y4 N15 A1 | |
2011-04-19 | RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2011-04-18 | OLSON (CHAIR), JOHNSON, HOLMES | |
2011-04-18 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2011-04-18 | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM N39 A1 | |
2011-04-18 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2011-04-18 | SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-04-18 | SPECIAL SESSION BILL | |
2011-04-17 | VERSION: SCS CSHB 24(FIN) | |
2011-04-17 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2011-04-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-17 | PASSED Y20 N- | |
2011-04-17 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 24(FIN) | |
2011-04-17 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-17 | FIN SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-17 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-17 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2011 | |
2011-04-16 | FN3: (S.FIN/CED) | |
2011-04-16 | NR: OLSON | |
2011-04-16 | DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, MCGUIRE, ELLIS | |
2011-04-16 | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR SAME TITLE | |
2011-04-13 | FN2: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2011-04-13 | DP: EGAN, GIESSEL, DAVIS, PASKVAN, MENARD | |
2011-04-13 | L&C RPT 5DP | |
2011-03-30 | L&C, FIN | |
2011-03-30 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-03-28 | VERSION: CSHB 24(FIN) | |
2011-03-28 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-03-28 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-03-28 | PASSED Y35 E4 A1 | |
2011-03-28 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 24(FIN) | |
2011-03-25 | HELD TO 3/28 CALENDAR | |
2011-03-23 | COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN | |
2011-03-23 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/25 CALENDAR | |
2011-03-23 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-03-23 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-03-23 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | FN2: (H.FIN/CED) | |
2011-03-23 | NR: GUTTENBERG, GARA | |
2011-03-23 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, JOULE, COSTELLO, EDGMON, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-03-23 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 8DP 2NR | |
2011-03-18 | FN1: (CED) | |
2011-03-18 | DP: CHENAULT, THOMPSON, SADDLER, JOHNSON, HOLMES, MILLER, OLSON | |
2011-03-18 | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 7DP | |
2011-01-18 | L&C, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |