AK HB235 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act creating the North Star Medal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

North Star Medal

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12SenateVERSION: CSHB 235(STA)
2018-05-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-12SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 235(STA)
2018-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/12/18
2018-04-18SenateFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2018-04-18SenateDP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
2018-04-18SenateSTA RPT 5DP
2017-05-08SenateSTA
2017-05-08SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-05-01HouseVERSION: CSHB 235(STA)
2017-05-01HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-05-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, JOSEPHSON, GARA, LEDOUX
2017-05-01HousePASSED Y40
2017-05-01HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 235(STA)
2017-04-28HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
2017-04-28HouseSTA CS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-28HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-28HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/2017
2017-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WOOL, TUCK
2017-04-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2017-04-21HouseFN1: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-21HouseDP: JOSEPHSON, BIRCH, TUCK, KREISS-TOMKINS
2017-04-21HouseSTA RPT CS(STA) 4DP
2017-04-16HouseSTA
2017-04-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback