AK HB233 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the display of documents on an electronic device.
Title
Electronic Display Of Required Documents
Sponsors
Rep. Sarah Vance [R] | Rep. Benjamin Carpenter [R] | Rep. Jonathan Kreiss-Tomkins [D] | Rep. Mel Gillis [R] |
Rep. DeLena Johnson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON |
2020-03-11 | House | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2020-03-11 | House | FN1: ZERO(DPS) |
2020-03-11 | House | DP: HOPKINS, VANCE, THOMPSON, SHAW, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2020-03-11 | House | STA RPT 6DP |
2020-03-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS, GILLIS |
2020-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CARPENTER |
2020-02-05 | House | STA, JUD |
2020-02-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB233 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB0233A.PDF |