AK HB233 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-12 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the insurance tax education credit, the income tax education credit, the oil or gas producer education credit, the property tax education credit, the mining business education credit, the fisheries business education credit, and the fisheries resource landing tax education credit; providing for an effective date by repealing the effective dates of secs. 3, 5, 7, 10, 14, 16, 18, 21, 23, 25, 28, 30, 32, 35, 37, 39, 42, 44, 46, 49, 51, 53, and 55, ch. 92, SLA 2010, sec. 14, ch. 7, FSSLA 2011, secs. 15, 17, 19, 21, 23, and 25, ch. 74, SLA 2012, sec. 49, ch. 14, SLA 2014, secs. 37, 40, 43, and 46, ch. 15, SLA 2014, and secs. 26 and 31, ch. 61, SLA 2014; providing for an effective date by amending the effective date of secs. 1, 2, and 21, ch. 61, SLA 2014; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Education Tax Credits

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-12HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-12SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 233(FIN)
2018-05-12SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-12SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 233(FIN)
2018-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-12SenateMOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
2018-05-12SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/12/18
2018-05-08SenateFN2: (REV)
2018-05-08SenateDP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-05-08SenateAM: MACKINNON
2018-05-08SenateFIN RPT SCS 5DP 1AM SAME TITLE
2018-04-13SenateFIN
2018-04-13SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-12HouseVERSION: CSHB 233(FIN) AM
2018-04-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, DRUMMOND, SADDLER, KOPP, BIRCH, JOSEPHSON
2018-04-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-12HousePASSED Y38 N1 E1
2018-04-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 233(FIN) AM
2018-04-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-12HouseAM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
2018-04-12HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y26 N13 E1
2018-04-12HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018
2018-04-11HouseFN1: (REV)
2018-04-11HouseAM: PRUITT, THOMPSON, TILTON, KAWASAKI
2018-04-11HouseNR: GARA, WILSON, ORTIZ
2018-04-11HouseDP: GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-11HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 3NR 4AM
2018-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2018-02-26HouseFN1: (REV)
2018-02-26HouseDP: TALERICO, PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, JOHNSTON, DRUMMOND
2018-02-26HouseEDC RPT 5DP
2018-02-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2018-01-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2017-04-15HouseEDC, FIN
2017-04-15HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback