AK HB233 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-08 - COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to sexual abuse and sexual assault awareness and prevention efforts in public schools.
Title
Sexual Abuse/assault Prevention Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-08 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CHENAULT |
2014-04-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN |
2014-04-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KREISS-TOMKINS |
2014-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG |
2014-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX, SEATON, P.WILSON, GATTIS, HERRON, REINBOLD, FOSTER |
2014-03-28 | House | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2014-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2014-03-28 | House | DP: LEDOUX, SEATON, KITO III, P.WILSON, REINBOLD, SADDLER, GATTIS |
2014-03-28 | House | EDC RPT 7DP |
2014-03-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES, EDGMON, COSTELLO |
2014-03-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NAGEAK, MUNOZ |
2014-03-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MILLETT |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2014-01-21 | House | EDC, FIN |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=28&bill=HB233 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/28/Bills/HB0233A.PDF |