AK HB23 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act creating a fund in the Department of Public Safety; providing for payment of certain medical insurance premiums for surviving dependents of certain peace officers or firefighters who die in the line of duty; relating to contributions from permanent fund dividends to the peace officer and firefighter survivors' fund; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ins. For Depends. Of Deceased Fire/police
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 8 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 8 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2017-06-22 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 14 SLA 17 |
2017-06-15 | House | 8:33 AM 6/15/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2017-05-01 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2017-04-26 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-26 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N2 |
2017-04-26 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP |
2017-04-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2017-04-21 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD |
2017-04-19 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 23(FIN) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2017-04-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-19 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-19 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2017-04-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 23(FIN) |
2017-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR |
2017-04-17 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FN5: (GOV/FUND CAP) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-04-16 | Senate | AM: OLSON |
2017-04-16 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, MICCICHE |
2017-04-16 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 6DP 1AM SAME TITLE |
2017-06-06 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR: COGHILL BEFORE MICCICHE |
2017-04-05 | Senate | VON IMHOF, DUNLEAVY, MACKINNON, STEDMAN |
2017-04-05 | Senate | BISHOP, EGAN, HUGHES, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, MEYER, KELLY, |
2017-04-05 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, COSTELLO, GIESSEL, STEVENS, GARDNER, |
2017-03-15 | Senate | FIN |
2017-03-15 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 23(FIN) AM |
2017-03-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-13 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, FANSLER |
2017-03-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-03-13 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-03-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(FIN) AM |
2017-03-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-13 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2017-03-13 | House | AM NO 7 ADOPTED UC |
2017-03-13 | House | AM NO 6 FAILED Y8 N32 |
2017-03-13 | House | AM NO 5 FAILED Y12 N28 |
2017-03-13 | House | AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N25 |
2017-03-13 | House | AM NO 3 FAILED Y11 N29 |
2017-03-13 | House | AM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2017-03-13 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N30 |
2017-03-13 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-03-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2017-03-10 | House | HELD TO 3/13 CALENDAR |
2017-03-10 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2017 |
2017-02-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, GUTTENBERG, MILLETT |
2017-02-17 | House | FN3: (GOV/FUND CAP) |
2017-02-17 | House | FN2: ZERO(DPS) |
2017-02-17 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2017-02-17 | House | AM: TILTON, WILSON, PRUITT |
2017-02-17 | House | DP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, SEATON, FOSTER |
2017-02-17 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3AM |
2017-02-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KOPP |
2017-01-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE |
2017-01-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN |
2017-01-18 | House | FIN |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |
Subjects
Death
Employment
Fire Protection
Funds
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Medical Care
Municipalities
Permanent Fund
Public Employees
Retirement
Employment
Fire Protection
Funds
Insurance
Law Enforcement
Medical Care
Municipalities
Permanent Fund
Public Employees
Retirement