AK HB23 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act creating a fund in the Department of Public Safety; providing for payment of certain medical insurance premiums for surviving dependents of certain peace officers or firefighters who die in the line of duty; relating to contributions from permanent fund dividends to the peace officer and firefighter survivors' fund; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ins. For Depends. Of Deceased Fire/police

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Dates (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 6 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 6 (Y: 8 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 12 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 15 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 11 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-13 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 10 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2017-06-22HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/21 CHAPTER 14 SLA 17
2017-06-15House8:33 AM 6/15/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2017-05-01HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2017-04-26HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-26HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 N2
2017-04-26HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2017-04-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2017-04-21HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2017-04-19SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 23(FIN)
2017-04-19SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2017-04-19SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-04-19SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2017-04-19SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2017-04-19SenateAM NO 1 FAILED Y6 N13 E1
2017-04-19SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
2017-04-19SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 23(FIN)
2017-04-17SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/19 CALENDAR
2017-04-17SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2017-04-17SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-17SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2017
2017-04-16SenateFN5: (GOV/FUND CAP)
2017-04-16SenateFN4: ZERO(ADM)
2017-04-16SenateFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2017-04-16SenateAM: OLSON
2017-04-16SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, MICCICHE
2017-04-16SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP 1AM SAME TITLE
2017-06-06SenateCROSS SPONSOR: COGHILL BEFORE MICCICHE
2017-04-05SenateVON IMHOF, DUNLEAVY, MACKINNON, STEDMAN
2017-04-05SenateBISHOP, EGAN, HUGHES, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, WILSON, MEYER, KELLY,
2017-04-05SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, COSTELLO, GIESSEL, STEVENS, GARDNER,
2017-03-15SenateFIN
2017-03-15SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-13HouseVERSION: CSHB 23(FIN) AM
2017-03-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, RAUSCHER, FANSLER
2017-03-13HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2017-03-13HousePASSED Y40
2017-03-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 23(FIN) AM
2017-03-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-13House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2017-03-13HouseAM NO 7 ADOPTED UC
2017-03-13HouseAM NO 6 FAILED Y8 N32
2017-03-13HouseAM NO 5 FAILED Y12 N28
2017-03-13HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N25
2017-03-13HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y11 N29
2017-03-13HouseAM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2017-03-13HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y10 N30
2017-03-13HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2017-03-10HouseHELD TO 3/13 CALENDAR
2017-03-10HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/10/2017
2017-02-17HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, GUTTENBERG, MILLETT
2017-02-17HouseFN3: (GOV/FUND CAP)
2017-02-17HouseFN2: ZERO(DPS)
2017-02-17HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2017-02-17HouseAM: TILTON, WILSON, PRUITT
2017-02-17HouseDP: GRENN, GUTTENBERG, GARA, KAWASAKI, ORTIZ, SEATON, FOSTER
2017-02-17HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3AM
2017-02-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2017-01-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE
2017-01-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2017-01-18HouseFIN
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB23
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0023A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0023B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0023C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0023D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0023Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=0472&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=0481&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=0482&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=0490&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=0500&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=1022&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=1023&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB23&jrn=1224&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback