AK HB227 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2-1)
Status: Passed on July 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-01 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to municipal energy and resilience improvement assessment programs; relating to the planning commission membership apportionment requirement for first and second class boroughs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Muni Energy Improvemnt; Planning Comm
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - House - House: Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - House: SCS HB 184(HSS) Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2022-05-17 - House - House: SCS HB 184(HSS) Concur (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-01 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/22 |
2022-07-01 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/30 CHAPTER 28 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-17 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 18 |
2022-05-17 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y37 N2 E1 |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-17 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-16 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 227(L&C) AM S |
2022-05-16 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-16 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-16 | Senate | AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS UC |
2022-05-16 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 227(L&C) |
2022-05-15 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/16 CAL |
2022-05-15 | Senate | L&C SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-15 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-15 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2022 |
2022-05-13 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, KIEHL, KAWASAKI, MICCICHE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-05-11 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE, REVAK |
2022-05-11 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 18 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | L&C RPT SCS(L&C) 4DP NEW TITLE |
2022-04-20 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | AM: WILSON |
2022-04-20 | Senate | DP: HUGHES, GRAY-JACKSON |
2022-04-20 | Senate | CRA RPT SCS(CRA) 2DP 1AM SAME TITLE |
2022-04-06 | Senate | CRA, L&C |
2022-04-06 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-04-04 | House | VERSION: HB 227 |
2022-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY |
2022-04-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-04 | House | PASSED Y31 N4 E4 A1 |
2022-04-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 227 |
2022-03-31 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/31 - ON 4/4 CALENDAR |
2022-03-31 | House | SESSION CANCELED 3/30 - ON 3/31 CALENDAR |
2022-03-31 | House | SESSION CANCELED 3/29 - ON 3/30 CALENDAR |
2022-03-28 | House | ADJOURNED TO 3/29 CALENDAR |
2022-03-24 | House | TECHNICAL SESSION 3/24 - ON 3/28 CALENDAR |
2022-03-24 | House | SESSION CANCELED 3/23 - ON 3/24 CALENDAR |
2022-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SNYDER, JOSEPHSON, WOOL |
2022-03-22 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/23 CALENDAR |
2022-03-22 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N20 E1 |
2022-03-22 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-22 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2022 |
2022-03-07 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-03-07 | House | AM: MCCARTY |
2022-03-07 | House | NR: PATKOTAK, PRAX, MCCABE |
2022-03-07 | House | DP: DRUMMOND, HANNAN, SCHRAGE |
2022-03-07 | House | CRA RPT 3DP 3NR 1AM |
2022-02-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, TARR |
2022-02-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN, FIELDS |
2022-01-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2022-01-31 | House | NR: KAUFMAN, RAUSCHER |
2022-01-31 | House | DP: ZULKOSKY, CLAMAN, FIELDS, SCHRAGE |
2022-01-31 | House | ENE RPT 4DP 2NR |
2022-01-18 | House | ENE, CRA |
2022-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/22 |