AK HB222 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-16 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the licensure of nail technicians; relating to the practice of manicuring; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Licensure Of Manicurists/nail Techs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(CED) |
2017-05-16 | Senate | AM: OLSON |
2017-05-16 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE |
2017-05-16 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES |
2017-05-16 | Senate | LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT |
2017-05-16 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 13 |
2017-05-16 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS 5DP 1NR 1AM NEW TITLE |
2017-05-03 | Senate | FIN |
2017-05-03 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-04-27 | House | VERSION: CSHB 222(L&C) AM |
2017-04-27 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-04-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2017-04-27 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2017-04-27 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2017-04-27 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2017-04-27 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-27 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC |
2017-04-27 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 222(L&C) |
2017-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR |
2017-04-26 | House | L&C CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-26 | House | AM: KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG |
2017-04-26 | House | NR: GARA, WILSON, ORTIZ, TILTON, SEATON |
2017-04-26 | House | DP: THOMPSON, GRENN, FOSTER |
2017-04-26 | House | FIN RPT CS(L&C) 3DP 5NR 2AM |
2017-04-24 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2017-04-24 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C |
2017-04-24 | House | FN1: (CED) |
2017-04-24 | House | NR: JOSEPHSON |
2017-04-24 | House | DP: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, WOOL, BIRCH, KITO |
2017-04-24 | House | L&C RPT CS(L&C) 4DP 1NR |
2017-04-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): BIRCH |
2017-04-08 | House | L&C |
2017-04-08 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |