AK HB221 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the duties of the Alaska Commission on Postsecondary Education; relating to a statewide workforce and education-related statistics program; relating to information obtained by the Department of Labor and Workforce Development; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workforce & Ed Related Statistics Program

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/19/18
2018-06-27HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 32 SLA 18
2018-06-27House3:05 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-05-01SenateVERSION: HB 221
2018-05-01SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-01SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GARDNER, STEVENS, BISHOP
2018-05-01SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-01SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-05-01SenateHUGHES MOTION TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING
2018-05-01SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 221
2018-05-01SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-01SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-01SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/2018
2018-04-20SenateFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2018-04-20SenateFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-04-20SenateNR: COGHILL, GIESSEL, HUGHES
2018-04-20SenateDP: STEVENS
2018-04-20SenateEDC RPT 1DP 3NR
2018-04-17SenateEDC
2018-04-17SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-15HouseVERSION: HB 221
2018-04-15HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-15HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2018-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2018-04-14HouseMILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-04-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-14HousePASSED Y36 N4
2018-04-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 221
2018-04-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2018
2018-04-11HouseFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2018-04-11HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-04-11HouseNR: WILSON, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, TILTON
2018-04-11HouseDP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, FOSTER
2018-04-11HouseFIN RPT 4DP 5NR
2018-03-07HouseFN2: ZERO(LWF)
2018-03-07HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-03-07HouseNR: TALERICO
2018-03-07HouseDP: PARISH, KOPP, JOHNSTON, DRUMMOND
2018-03-07HouseEDC RPT 4DP 1NR
2017-04-08HouseEDC, FIN
2017-04-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback