AK HB220 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-15 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska and the teachers' retirement system; providing certain employees an opportunity to choose between the defined benefit and defined contribution plans of the Public Employees' Retirement System of Alaska and the teachers' retirement system; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement Systems; Defined Benefit Opt.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-15HouseREFERRED TO RULES
2022-05-15HouseFN3: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)
2022-05-15HouseNR: LEBON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK
2022-05-15HouseDP: ORTIZ, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
2022-05-15HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 4DP 3NR
2022-05-09HouseRETURNED TO FINANCE COMMITTEE
2022-04-27HouseFN2: (ADM/RETIREMENT PAYMENTS)
2022-04-27HouseNR: MERRICK
2022-04-27HouseDNP: CARPENTER, THOMPSON
2022-04-27HouseDP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER
2022-04-27HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 2DNP 1NR
2022-04-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WOOL, TUCK, JOSEPHSON
2022-02-25HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ZULKOSKY
2022-02-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR, CLAMAN, EDGMON
2022-01-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HANNAN
2022-01-27HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
2022-01-27HouseNR: MCCARTY, KAUFMAN, NELSON
2022-01-27HouseDP: SCHRAGE, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2022-01-27HouseL&C RPT 4DP 3NR
2022-01-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ
2022-01-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SNYDER, SCHRAGE, ORTIZ
2021-05-19HouseL&C, FIN
2021-05-19HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback