AK HB219 | 2023-2024 | 33rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on September 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/4/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Passed on September 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-04 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/4/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the assistive technology loan guarantee and interest subsidy program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal Assistive Technology Loan Program
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Saddler [R] | Rep. William Fields [D] | Rep. Jennifer Armstrong [D] | Rep. Alyse Galvin [I] |
Rep. Calvin Schrage [N] | Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Sen. Mike Cronk [R] | Rep. Will Stapp [R] |
Rep. Cathy Tilton [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/4/24 |
2024-09-04 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 9/3 CHAPTER 52 SLA 24 |
2024-08-27 | House | 2:10 P.M. 8/27/24 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2024-05-14 | Senate | VERSION: HB 219 |
2024-05-14 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2024-05-14 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-05-14 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2024-05-13 | Senate | HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/14 CAL |
2024-05-13 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 219 |
2024-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/13 CAL |
2024-05-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-05-12 | Senate | RULES TO FIRST SUP CALENDAR 5/12/2024 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2024-05-07 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN, OLSON |
2024-05-07 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, WILSON, KIEHL, BISHOP |
2024-05-07 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR |
2024-04-19 | Senate | FIN |
2024-04-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-04-18 | House | VERSION: HB 219 |
2024-04-18 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2024-04-18 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2024-04-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2024-04-18 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2024-04-18 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 219 |
2024-04-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, STORY, CRONK, STAPP |
2024-04-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/18 CALENDAR |
2024-04-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2024-04-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2024 |
2024-04-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GALVIN |
2024-04-15 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2024-04-15 | House | NR: TOMASZEWSKI |
2024-04-15 | House | DP: STAPP, GALVIN, HANNAN, JOSEPHSON, COULOMBE, ORTIZ, CRONK, EDGMON, FOSTER |
2024-04-15 | House | FIN RPT 9DP 1NR |
2024-02-20 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ARMSTRONG |
2024-02-15 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2024-01-16 | House | FIN |
2024-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2024-01-16 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/24 |