AK HB217 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 3 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - FN3: (DNR)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to civil liability for risks inherent in farm touring; relating to the state and municipal procurement preferences for agricultural products harvested in the state and fisheries products harvested or processed in the state; relating to merchandise sold and certain fees charged or collected by the Department of Natural Resources; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Food Procurement; Farm Tours; Fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06HouseFN3: (DNR)
2018-06-06HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-06HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-05-09HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-04HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-03SenateVERSION: CSHB 217(FIN)
2018-05-03SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-03SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-03SenatePASSED Y18 N- E2
2018-05-03SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 217(FIN)
2018-05-03SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-03SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-03SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/3/2018
2018-05-02SenateFN3: (DNR)
2018-05-02SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-05-02SenateFIN RPT 7DP
2018-04-18SenateRES REFERRAL WAIVED UC
2018-04-13SenateRES, FIN
2018-04-13SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-12HouseVERSION: CSHB 217(FIN)
2018-04-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, GRENN, TUCK
2018-04-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-12HousePASSED Y37 N2 E1
2018-04-12HouseBEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING
2018-04-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 217(FIN)
2018-04-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-12HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018
2018-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PRUITT
2018-04-09HouseFN3: (DNR)
2018-04-09HouseAM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON
2018-04-09HouseNR: THOMPSON, ORTIZ, GRENN
2018-04-09HouseDP: GARA, PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-09HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 5DP 3NR 3AM
2018-04-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2018-02-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2018-02-19HouseFN3: (DNR)
2018-02-19HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DEC)
2018-02-19HouseFN1: INDETERMINATE(DEC)
2018-02-19HouseAM: PARISH
2018-02-19HouseNR: CHENAULT, LINCOLN
2018-02-19HouseDP: TALERICO, JOHNSON, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON, TARR
2018-02-19HouseRES RPT CS(RES) NT 5DP 2NR 1AM
2018-02-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2017-04-07HouseRES, FIN
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback