AK HB216 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to restitution; relating to the office of victims' rights; relating to transfers from the dividend fund; creating the restorative justice account; relating to appropriations from the restorative justice account for services for and payments to crime victims, operating costs of the Violent Crimes Compensation Board, operation of domestic violence and sexual assault programs, mental health services and substance abuse treatment for offenders, and incarceration costs; relating to contributions from dividends; relating to delinquent minors; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Crimes;restitution;dividend Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/19 |
2018-06-27 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/14 CHAPTER 21 SLA 18 |
2018-06-27 | House | 3:31 PM 6/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | FN18: (CC:HB286/FUND CAP) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN17: (CC:HB286/LEG) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN16: (CC:HB286/COR) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN9: (ADM) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN7: (REV) |
2018-06-27 | House | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286 |
2018-06-27 | House | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18 |
2018-05-09 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-04-30 | Senate | VERSION: CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM |
2018-04-30 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-04-30 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL |
2018-04-30 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-30 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2018-04-30 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM |
2018-04-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-30 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-30 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018 |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN15: (LEG) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN14: (COR) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN13: INDETERMINATE(AJS) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN10: (ADM/FUND CAP) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN9: (ADM) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN8: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN7: (REV) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-27 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE |
2018-04-27 | Senate | FIN RPT 6DP |
2018-04-18 | Senate | HUGHES |
2018-04-18 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEDMAN, BISHOP, COSTELLO, VON IMHOF, SHOWER |
2018-04-13 | Senate | FIN |
2018-04-13 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-04-12 | House | VERSION: CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM |
2018-04-12 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-04-12 | House | JOSEPHSON, RAUSCHER, CHENAULT, SULLIVAN-LEONARD |
2018-04-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, BIRCH, PARISH, DRUMMOND, TUCK, REINBOLD, TARR, |
2018-04-12 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2018-04-12 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2018-04-12 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM |
2018-04-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-04-12 | House | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION |
2018-04-12 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N18 |
2018-04-12 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-04-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-04-12 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-11 | House | FN13: INDETERMINATE(AJS) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN12: (LEG) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN11: (COR) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN10: (ADM/FUND CAP) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN9: (ADM) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN8: ZERO(LAW) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN7: (REV) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-11 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-04-11 | House | AM: KAWASAKI, WILSON |
2018-04-11 | House | DP: GARA, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-04-11 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP 2AM |
2018-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG |
2018-04-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ |
2018-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STUTES |
2018-01-31 | House | FN7: (REV) |
2018-01-31 | House | FN6: (LEG) |
2018-01-31 | House | FN5: (COR) |
2018-01-31 | House | FN4: (AJS) |
2018-01-31 | House | FN3: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-01-31 | House | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2018-01-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2018-01-31 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2018-01-31 | House | DP: KOPP, LEDOUX, MILLETT, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN |
2018-01-31 | House | JUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1AM |
2018-01-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER |
2018-01-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2018-01-16 | House | JUD, FIN |
2018-01-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-01-16 | House | SPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED |
2017-11-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN |
2017-10-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GRENN |
2017-04-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SADDLER |
2017-04-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE |
2017-04-07 | House | JUD, FIN |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Boards & Commissions
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Funds
Legislature
Mental Health
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Permanent Fund
Public Finance
State Aid
Victims Rights
Corrections
Courts
Crimes
Criminal Procedure
Domestic Violence
Funds
Legislature
Mental Health
Minors
Nonprofit Organizations
Permanent Fund
Public Finance
State Aid
Victims Rights