AK HB216 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to restitution; relating to the office of victims' rights; relating to transfers from the dividend fund; creating the restorative justice account; relating to appropriations from the restorative justice account for services for and payments to crime victims, operating costs of the Violent Crimes Compensation Board, operation of domestic violence and sexual assault programs, mental health services and substance abuse treatment for offenders, and incarceration costs; relating to contributions from dividends; relating to delinquent minors; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Crimes;restitution;dividend Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 1/1/19
2018-06-27HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 6/14 CHAPTER 21 SLA 18
2018-06-27House3:31 PM 6/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-06-27HouseFN18: (CC:HB286/FUND CAP)
2018-06-27HouseFN17: (CC:HB286/LEG)
2018-06-27HouseFN16: (CC:HB286/COR)
2018-06-27HouseFN9: (ADM)
2018-06-27HouseFN7: (REV)
2018-06-27HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-27HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-05-09HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-30SenateVERSION: CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
2018-04-30SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-30SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
2018-04-30SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-30SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
2018-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018
2018-04-27SenateFN15: (LEG)
2018-04-27SenateFN14: (COR)
2018-04-27SenateFN13: INDETERMINATE(AJS)
2018-04-27SenateFN10: (ADM/FUND CAP)
2018-04-27SenateFN9: (ADM)
2018-04-27SenateFN8: ZERO(LAW)
2018-04-27SenateFN7: (REV)
2018-04-27SenateFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-27SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-27SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-04-27SenateFIN RPT 6DP
2018-04-18SenateHUGHES
2018-04-18SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, STEDMAN, BISHOP, COSTELLO, VON IMHOF, SHOWER
2018-04-13SenateFIN
2018-04-13SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-12HouseVERSION: CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
2018-04-12HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-12HouseJOSEPHSON, RAUSCHER, CHENAULT, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-04-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, BIRCH, PARISH, DRUMMOND, TUCK, REINBOLD, TARR,
2018-04-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-12HousePASSED Y40
2018-04-12HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSSSHB 216(FIN) AM
2018-04-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-12House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-04-12HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N18
2018-04-12HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2018
2018-04-11HouseFN13: INDETERMINATE(AJS)
2018-04-11HouseFN12: (LEG)
2018-04-11HouseFN11: (COR)
2018-04-11HouseFN10: (ADM/FUND CAP)
2018-04-11HouseFN9: (ADM)
2018-04-11HouseFN8: ZERO(LAW)
2018-04-11HouseFN7: (REV)
2018-04-11HouseFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-11HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-04-11HouseAM: KAWASAKI, WILSON
2018-04-11HouseDP: GARA, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-11HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 9DP 2AM
2018-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, KAWASAKI, GUTTENBERG
2018-04-06HouseCOSPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
2018-04-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): STUTES
2018-01-31HouseFN7: (REV)
2018-01-31HouseFN6: (LEG)
2018-01-31HouseFN5: (COR)
2018-01-31HouseFN4: (AJS)
2018-01-31HouseFN3: ZERO(DHS)
2018-01-31HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2018-01-31HouseFN1: ZERO(ADM)
2018-01-31HouseAM: EASTMAN
2018-01-31HouseDP: KOPP, LEDOUX, MILLETT, KREISS-TOMKINS, CLAMAN
2018-01-31HouseJUD RPT CS(JUD) NT 5DP 1AM
2018-01-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER
2018-01-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2018-01-16HouseJUD, FIN
2018-01-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-01-16HouseSPONSOR SUBSTITUTE INTRODUCED
2017-11-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2017-10-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2017-04-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
2017-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WESTLAKE
2017-04-07HouseJUD, FIN
2017-04-07HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback