AK HB216 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 20 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-21 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act adding the Inupiaq, Siberian Yupik, Central Alaskan Yup'ik, Alutiiq, Unangax, Dena'ina, Deg Xinag, Holikachuk, Koyukon, Upper Kuskokwim, Gwich'in, Tanana, Upper Tanana, Tanacross, H
Title
Official Languages Of The State
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-20 - Senate - Senate:
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
CSHB 216(STA) Third Reading - Final Passage(Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | House | AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV |
2014-04-20 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 216(STA) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N2 |
2014-04-20 | Senate | DUNLEAVY, MCGUIRE, GARDNER, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, HOFFMAN, MEYER, STEDMAN |
2014-04-20 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON, FRENCH, STEVENS, ELLIS, WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 216(STA) |
2014-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-20 | Senate | RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/20/14 |
2014-04-19 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2014-04-19 | Senate | AM: COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-04-19 | Senate | DP: DYSON, WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-04-19 | Senate | STA RPT 2DP 2AM |
2014-04-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): EGAN, DYSON |
2014-04-17 | Senate | STA |
2014-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-04-16 | House | VERSION: CSHB 216(STA) |
2014-04-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, COSTELLO, FEIGE |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E1 A3 |
2014-04-16 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-04-16 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-04-16 | House | PASSED Y38 A2 |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 216(STA) |
2014-04-16 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-16 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-16 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2014-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, GRUENBERG, ISAACSON, TUCK, HOLMES, SEATON |
2014-04-01 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2014-04-01 | House | DP: KREISS-TOMKINS, ISAACSON, KELLER, GATTIS, LYNN |
2014-04-01 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 5DP |
2014-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ |
2014-03-27 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2014-03-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KITO III |
2014-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND, LEDOUX |
2014-02-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2014-02-19 | House | DP: FOSTER, HERRON, DRUMMOND, LEDOUX, NAGEAK |
2014-02-19 | House | CRA RPT 5DP |
2014-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FOSTER |
2014-01-21 | House | CRA, STA |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |
Subjects
Communications
Courts
Executive Branch
Legislature
Municipalities
Natives
Public Corporations
Public Meetings
Public Records
Rights
School Districts
Universities
Courts
Executive Branch
Legislature
Municipalities
Natives
Public Corporations
Public Meetings
Public Records
Rights
School Districts
Universities