AK HB215 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/22/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-25 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/22/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to program receipts; and relating to fees for services provided by the Department of Health and Social Services.
Title
Dhss: Public Health Fees
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-25 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/22/18 |
2018-07-25 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/24 CHAPTER 68 SLA 18 |
2018-07-23 | House | 1:33 PM 7/23/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-06-27 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 215(FIN) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-12 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N3 E1 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 215(FIN) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-12 | Senate | MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018 |
2018-04-14 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2018-04-14 | Senate | NR: OLSON |
2018-04-14 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, MICCICHE |
2018-04-14 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 1NR |
2018-03-28 | Senate | FN2: (DHS) |
2018-03-28 | Senate | AM: MICCICHE |
2018-03-28 | Senate | DP: BEGICH, GIESSEL |
2018-03-28 | Senate | NR: WILSON, VON IMHOF |
2018-03-28 | Senate | HSS RPT 2DP 2NR 1AM |
2018-02-19 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2018-02-19 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2018-02-16 | House | VERSION: CSHB 215(FIN) |
2018-02-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2018-02-16 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y28 N4 E7 V1 |
2018-02-16 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2018-02-14 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2018-02-14 | House | PASSED Y30 N8 E1 V1 |
2018-02-14 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 215(FIN) |
2018-02-12 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/14 CALENDAR |
2018-02-12 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2018-02-12 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-02-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2018 |
2018-02-07 | House | FN2: (DHS) |
2018-02-07 | House | NR: TILTON, GUTTENBERG, WILSON, KAWASAKI |
2018-02-07 | House | DP: GRENN, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, GARA, SEATON, FOSTER |
2018-02-07 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 4NR |
2017-05-10 | House | FN1: (DHS) |
2017-05-10 | House | AM: EASTMAN |
2017-05-10 | House | NR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO |
2017-05-10 | House | DP: JOHNSTON, EDGMON, SPOHNHOLZ |
2017-05-10 | House | HSS RPT CS(HSS) 3DP 2NR 1AM |
2017-04-07 | House | HSS, FIN |
2017-04-07 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |