AK HB214 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-11 - COSPONSOR REMOVED: EASTMAN
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the Department of Education and Early Development; relating to dating violence and abuse training, awareness, prevention, and notices; and establishing the month of February as Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teen Dating Viol:programs;awareness Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - On Reconsideration (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate: Discharge from Finance Committee (Y: 7 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Add Finance Committee Referral (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-11HouseCOSPONSOR REMOVED: EASTMAN
2018-05-11HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-11HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 32
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y39 N1
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-11SenateVERSION: SCS HB 214(FIN)
2018-05-11SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-11SenatePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- E1
2018-05-11SenateRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-05-11SenateGARDNER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-05-11SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 214(FIN)
2018-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-11SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-11SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 5/11/18
2018-05-11SenateFN2: (EED)
2018-05-11SenateDP: MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-05-11SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 32
2018-05-11SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP NEW TITLE
2018-05-07SenateMOTION TO DISCHARGE FROM FIN COMMITTEE FAILED Y7 N12 E1
2018-04-09SenateIN ACCORDANCE WITH UR 48(B) MOVED TO FINANCE
2018-04-09SenateFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD Y12 N7 A1
2018-04-06SenateJUD WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2018-04-06SenateUR 48(A) REQUEST RECEIVED
2018-03-28SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): OLSON
2018-03-21SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, SHOWER
2018-03-16SenateMEYER, MICCICHE, STEVENS, BISHOP
2018-03-16SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, BEGICH, HUGHES, GARDNER, EGAN, WIELECHOWSKI, WILSON
2018-03-16SenateFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-03-16SenateDNP: COGHILL
2018-03-16SenateDP: STEVENS, BEGICH, HUGHES
2018-03-16SenateEDC RPT 3DP 1DNP
2018-02-16SenateEDC, JUD
2018-02-16SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-02-14HouseVERSION: HB 214
2018-02-14HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-02-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SADDLER
2018-02-14HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-02-14HousePASSED Y38 E1 V1
2018-02-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 214
2018-02-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK, GUTTENBERG
2018-02-12HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/14 CALENDAR
2018-02-12HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/12/2018
2018-02-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP, JOHNSTON, PRUITT
2018-02-09HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-02-09HouseDP: TALERICO, PARISH, SPOHNHOLZ, KOPP, JOHNSTON, DRUMMOND
2018-02-09HouseEDC RPT 6DP
2018-01-29HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WOOL
2018-01-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, PARISH
2018-01-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2018-01-24House1ST COSPONSOR: MILLETT
2018-01-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SEATON, KAWASAKI, REINBOLD, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON
2017-10-30HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2017-04-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TILTON
2017-04-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
2017-04-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX
2017-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2017-04-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
2017-04-11HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN, KITO
2017-04-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2017-04-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): CLAMAN
2017-04-05HouseEDC
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback