AK HB213 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - FN5: (S.FIN/EED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act creating the education endowment fund and the dividend raffle fund; relating to the definition of 'gambling'; relating to the investment, appropriation, and administration of the public school trust fund; authorizing donations from the permanent fund dividend for educational purposes and to enter the permanent fund dividend raffle; relating to transfers from the dividend raffle fund and the education endowment fund; relating to the duties of the Department of Revenue; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pub. School Trust Fund;education Raffle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 28 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 37 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - House - House: Concur (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date Reconsideration (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 17 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseFN5: (S.FIN/EED)
2018-06-27HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-27HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-27HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-12HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y28 N12
2018-05-12HouseRESCIND ACTION (ADP) CONCUR UC
2018-05-12HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y37 N3
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y26 N14
2018-05-12HouseTITLE CHANGE: SCR 36
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-12HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-12SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 213(RLS)
2018-05-12SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-12SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-12SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 213(RLS)
2018-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-12SenateRLS SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12SenateRULES TO 2ND SUP CALENDAR 5/12/18
2018-05-12SenateFN7: (REV)
2018-05-12SenateFN6: (REV)
2018-05-12SenateFN5: (S.FIN/EED)
2018-05-12SenateFN4: ZERO(EED/FUND CAP)
2018-05-12SenateFN2: (EED)
2018-05-12SenateNR: GARDNER
2018-05-12SenateDP: MEYER, MICCICHE, MACKINNON, KELLY
2018-05-12SenateTITLE CHANGE: SCR 36
2018-05-12SenateRLS RPT SCS 4DP 1NR NEW TITLE
2018-05-12SenateRLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2018-04-23SenateFN5: (S.FIN/EED)
2018-04-23SenateFN4: ZERO(EED/FUND CAP)
2018-04-23SenateFN2: (EED)
2018-04-23SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-04-23SenateFIN RPT SCS 6DP SAME TITLE
2018-03-21SenateFIN
2018-03-21SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-19HouseVERSION: CSHB 213(FIN)(EFD FLD)
2018-03-19HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-19House...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
2018-03-19HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) FAILED Y24 N15 E1
2018-03-19HousePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N18 E1
2018-03-19HouseRECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
2018-03-15HouseWILSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-03-15HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N9 E3
2018-03-15HousePASSED Y21 N16 E3
2018-03-15HouseAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2018-03-15HouseAM NO 2 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
2018-03-15HouseRETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 2 UC
2018-03-15HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 213(FIN)
2018-03-14HouseHELD TO 3/15 CALENDAR
2018-03-12HouseHELD TO 3/14 CALENDAR
2018-03-12HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/12/2018
2018-02-26HouseRETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
2018-02-23HouseHELD TO 2/26 CALENDAR
2018-02-21HouseHELD TO NEXT CALENDAR
2018-02-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, TUCK
2018-02-19HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/21 CALENDAR
2018-02-19HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y17 N19 E3 V1
2018-02-19HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-02-19HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-02-19HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/2018
2018-02-12HouseFN3: (EED)
2018-02-12HouseFN2: (EED)
2018-02-12HouseFN1: ZERO(EED/FUND CAP)
2018-02-12HouseAM: WILSON, KAWASAKI, TILTON
2018-02-12HouseNR: THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN
2018-02-12HouseDP: GARA, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-02-12HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 3DP 3NR 3AM
2018-02-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2018-01-31HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, GARA
2017-04-05HouseFIN
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/30?Root=HB213
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0213A.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0213B.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0213C.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0213D.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0213E.PDF
Texthttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/30/Bills/HB0213Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=2473&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=2718&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=2719&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=2752&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=2753&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=3137&hse=S
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=3741&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=3742&hse=H
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_jrn_page.asp?session=30&bill=HB213&jrn=3765&hse=H

Bill Comments

feedback