AK HB212 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - FN2: (EED)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to funding for school construction and major maintenance; relating to the regional educational attendance area and small municipal school district fund; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Construction;reaa/small Muni Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-11 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-04-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-06HouseFN2: (EED)
2018-06-06HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 286
2018-06-06HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/4/18
2018-06-04HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-05-11HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-11HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N4
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP
2018-05-11HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ AND HELD
2018-05-11SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 212(FIN)
2018-05-11SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2018-05-11SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11SenatePASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N- E1
2018-05-11SenateRECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2018-05-11SenateGARDNER NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2018-05-11SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-05-11SenatePASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 212(FIN)
2018-05-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-11SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2018-05-11SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-11SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/11/2018
2018-05-08SenateFN2: (EED)
2018-05-08SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-05-08SenateFIN RPT SCS 7DP SAME TITLE
2018-04-14SenateFIN
2018-04-14SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-13HouseVERSION: CSHB 212(RLS)
2018-04-13HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TUCK, STUTES
2018-04-13HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-13HousePASSED Y36 A4
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 212(RLS)
2018-04-13HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-13HouseRLS CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-13HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-13HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2018
2018-04-13HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-04-13HouseNR: CHENAULT, REINBOLD, EASTMAN, LEDOUX
2018-04-13HouseDP: TUCK, CLAMAN, STUTES
2018-04-13HouseRLS RPT CS(RLS) NT 3DP 4NR
2018-04-12HouseRLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23A
2018-04-02HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON
2018-04-02HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-04-02HouseNR: TILTON, PRUITT, KAWASAKI
2018-04-02HouseDP: GUTTENBERG, ORTIZ, GARA, WILSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-02HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) 6DP 3NR
2018-02-26HouseFN1: ZERO(EED)
2018-02-26HouseDP: TALERICO, PARISH, JOHNSTON, SPOHNHOLZ, DRUMMOND
2018-02-26HouseEDC RPT 5DP
2018-02-09HouseBILL REPRINTED 2/9/18
2018-02-09HousePRIME SPONSOR: FOSTER
2017-04-05HouseEDC, FIN
2017-04-05HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback