AK HB212 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/5/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/5/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to an exemption from driver licensing requirements for spouses of members of the armed forces of the United States.
Title
Driver's Licensing Exemption: Military
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - House: HB 212 Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - House: HB 212 Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 2 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - House: HB 212 Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-17 - House - House: HB 212 Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/5/14 |
2014-07-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/7 CHAPTER 58 SLA 14 |
2014-07-02 | House | 9:55 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: HB 212 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2014-04-14 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI, MICCICHE, DYSON |
2014-04-14 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH, MCGUIRE, BISHOP, GIESSEL, EGAN, MEYER, |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 212 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014 |
2014-03-26 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-03-26 | Senate | AM: WIELECHOWSKI |
2014-03-26 | Senate | DP: DYSON, COGHILL, GIESSEL |
2014-03-26 | Senate | STA RPT 3DP 1AM |
2014-03-18 | Senate | STA |
2014-03-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-17 | House | VERSION: HB 212 |
2014-03-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-17 | House | PASSED Y36 E3 A1 |
2014-03-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 212 |
2014-03-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-03-17 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N22 E3 A1 |
2014-03-17 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING W/ AM PENDING |
2014-03-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE |
2014-03-14 | House | HELD IN SECOND READING TO 3/17/14 |
2014-03-14 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED & PENDING |
2014-03-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-03-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, KELLER, GATTIS |
2014-02-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-19 | House | AM: KREISS-TOMKINS |
2014-02-19 | House | DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, HUGHES, LYNN |
2014-02-19 | House | STA RPT 5DP 1AM |
2014-02-12 | House | FN1: ZERO(ADM) |
2014-02-12 | House | AM: GRUENBERG |
2014-02-12 | House | DP: HIGGINS, HUGHES, FOSTER, LEDOUX |
2014-02-12 | House | MLV RPT 4DP 1AM |
2014-01-21 | House | MLV, STA |
2014-01-21 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-01-21 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/14 |