AK HB209 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-21 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to emergency firefighters; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Emergency Firefighters
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-21 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/21/22 |
2022-06-21 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 10 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-04-25 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 209(FIN) |
2022-04-25 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2022-04-25 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | WILSON, GRAY-JACKSON, MICCICHE |
2022-04-25 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUGHES, HOLLAND, BISHOP, STEVENS, REINBOLD, STEDMAN, MYERS |
2022-04-25 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 209(FIN) |
2022-04-20 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/25 CAL |
2022-04-20 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-04-20 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/2022 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2022-04-06 | Senate | DP: MICCICHE, KIEHL, VON IMHOF, STEVENS |
2022-04-06 | Senate | RES RPT 4DP |
2022-03-23 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI |
2022-03-23 | Senate | RES |
2022-03-23 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-03-22 | House | VERSION: CSHB 209(FIN) |
2022-03-22 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, WOOL, HOPKINS, TILTON, STUTES, TUCK, NELSON |
2022-03-22 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-03-22 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2022-03-22 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 209(FIN) |
2022-03-21 | House | COSPONSOR(S): THOMPSON, SNYDER, SHAW, MCCABE, TARR |
2022-03-21 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/22 CALENDAR |
2022-03-21 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-03-21 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-03-21 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2022 |
2022-03-14 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2022-03-14 | House | NR: WOOL, JOSEPHSON |
2022-03-14 | House | DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, JOHNSON, MERRICK |
2022-03-14 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 5DP 2NR |
2022-03-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MERRICK |
2022-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE |
2022-02-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DNR) |
2022-02-28 | House | NR: HOPKINS, HANNAN, SCHRAGE |
2022-02-28 | House | DP: MCKAY, FIELDS, CRONK, RAUSCHER, GILLHAM, PATKOTAK |
2022-02-28 | House | RES RPT 6DP 3NR |
2022-02-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK |
2022-02-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FIELDS |
2022-02-07 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GILLHAM |
2022-02-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER, MCKAY |
2021-05-12 | House | RES, FIN |
2021-05-12 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |