AK HB205 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-29 - COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-29 - COSPONSOR(S): TUCK
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the permanent fund dividend of an otherwise qualified individual who dies during the qualifying year; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Permanent Fund Dividend For Deceased
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-29 | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK | |
2010-01-19 | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2009-04-14 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-14 | FN1: (REV) | |
2009-04-14 | DNP: SEATON | |
2009-04-14 | DP: PETERSEN, P.WILSON, GRUENBERG, LYNN | |
2009-04-14 | STA RPT CS(STA) 4DP 1DNP | |
2009-03-25 | STA, FIN | |
2009-03-25 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |