AK HB204 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-17 - COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-17 - COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act increasing the number of students pursuing a medical education who are provided postsecondary educational services and programs; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Postsecondary Medical Educ. Prog.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | COSPONSOR(S): HOLMES | |
2009-04-03 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2009-04-03 | FN1: (EED) | |
2009-04-03 | NR: KELLER | |
2009-04-03 | DP: P.WILSON, GARDNER, BUCH, SEATON | |
2009-04-03 | EDC RPT 4DP 1NR | |
2009-04-01 | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ | |
2009-03-25 | COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA | |
2009-03-23 | EDC, FIN | |
2009-03-23 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/basis/get_bill.asp?session=26&bill=HB204 |
Text | https://www.legis.state.ak.us/PDF/26/Bills/HB0204A.PDF |