AK HB203 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - COSPONSOR REMOVED: THOMPSON
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-04 - COSPONSOR REMOVED: THOMPSON
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing the offense of misconduct involving weapons in the sixth degree.
Title
Misconduct Involving Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Adam Wool [D] | Rep. Andrew Josephson [D] | Rep. Ivy Spohnholz [D] | Rep. Sara Hannan [D] |
Rep. Andrea Story [D] | Rep. Harriet Drummond [D] | Rep. Geran Tarr [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: THOMPSON |
2022-03-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR |
2022-03-02 | House | COSPONSOR(S): STORY, DRUMMOND |
2021-06-11 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HANNAN |
2021-05-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-05-05 | House | REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS |
2021-05-05 | House | STA, JUD |
2021-05-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB203 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0203A.PDF |