AK HB2001 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-20 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Approp: Era/operating/funds/other

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approp: Era/operating/funds/other

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2019-07-29 - House - House: Effective Date Concur (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-29 - House - House: Concur (Y: 23 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 17 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-07-29 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-07-29 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 4 (Y: 9 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-07-29 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 5 (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Finance CS (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-07-24 - House - House: Second Reading Adopt Finance CS (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-20HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2019-08-20HousePARTIAL VETO AND REDUCTIONS
2019-08-20HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 8/19 CHAPTER 2 SSSLA 19
2019-08-07House9:11 AM 8/7/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2019-07-31HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2019-07-31SenateENGROSSED AND RETURNED TO HOUSE 7/30
2019-07-29HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y32 N6 E2
2019-07-29HouseCONCUR AM OF (S) Y23 N15 E2
2019-07-29HouseCONCUR MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
2019-07-29HouseWAIVE UNIFORM RULE 41(C) UC
2019-07-29HouseCONCUR MESSAGE READ
2019-07-29SenateVERSION: SCS CSHB 2001(FIN) AM S
2019-07-29SenateTRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED
2019-07-29SenateENGROSSMENT WAIVED, RULE 43(B)
2019-07-29SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y18 N- E2
2019-07-29SenatePASSED Y17 N1 E2
2019-07-29SenateAUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2019-07-29SenateAM NO 4 FAILED Y9 N11
2019-07-29SenateAM NO 5 ADOPTED Y11 N9
2019-07-29SenateAM NO 3 ADOPTED UC
2019-07-29SenateAM NO 2 ADOPTED UC
2019-07-29SenateAM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
2019-07-29SenateRETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS TODAY UC
2019-07-29SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 2001(FIN)
2019-07-28SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING 7/29 CALENDAR
2019-07-28SenateFIN SCS ADOPTED UC
2019-07-28SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-07-28SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 7/28/2019
2019-07-28SenateNR: MICCICHE, SHOWER
2019-07-28SenateDP: HOFFMAN
2019-07-28SenateAM: STEDMAN, VON IMHOF, WILSON, BISHOP
2019-07-28SenateFIN RPT SCS 4AM 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
2019-07-27SenateFIN
2019-07-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2019-07-24HouseVERSION: CSHB 2001(FIN) AM
2019-07-24HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2019-07-24HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y29 N2 E9
2019-07-24HousePASSED Y21 N10 E9
2019-07-24HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2001(FIN) AM
2019-07-24HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2019-07-24HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y11 N20 E9
2019-07-24HouseAM NO 1 ADOPTED Y22 N7 E11
2019-07-24HouseAM NO 3 ADOPTED Y19 N10 E11
2019-07-24HouseFIN CS ADOPTED Y19 N10 E11
2019-07-24HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2019-07-23HouseNOT TAKEN UP 7/23 - ON 7/24 CALENDAR
2019-07-23HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 7/23/2019
2019-07-22HouseAM: TILTON, MERRICK, SULLIVAN-LEONARD
2019-07-22HouseDP: ORTIZ, LEBON, JOSEPHSON, WOOL, KNOPP, FOSTER, JOHNSTON
2019-07-22HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 7DP 3AM
2019-07-08HouseFIN
2019-07-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/31?Root=HB2001
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB2001A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB2001B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/A/HB2001-H001.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB2001C.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB2001D.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB2001E.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/31/Bills/HB2001Z.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2001&Page=01309#1309
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2001&Page=01310#1310
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2001&Page=01311#1311
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2001&Page=01312#1312
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2001&Page=01314#1314
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=HB2001&Page=01419#1419
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=HB2001&Page=01420#1420
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=HB2001&Page=01421#1421
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=S&Bill=HB2001&Page=01422#1422
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2001&Page=01339#1339
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/31?Chamber=H&Bill=HB2001&Page=01340#1340

Bill Comments

feedback