AK HB2 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-31 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to a voluntary preference for members of the national guard and veterans by private employers.
Title
Priv Employer Voluntary Vet Preference
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-31 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/27/18 |
2018-07-31 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/29 CHAPTER 71 SLA 18 |
2018-07-25 | House | 3:23 PM 7/25/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2018-05-12 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 2(MLV) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2018-05-12 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2018-05-12 | Senate | EGAN, COGHILL, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, WILSON, OLSON, VON IMHOF, KELLY |
2018-05-12 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, MICCICHE, SHOWER, BISHOP, STEVENS, HOFFMAN, HUGHES |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(MLV) |
2018-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2018-05-12 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2018-05-12 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018 |
2018-05-11 | Senate | L&C REFERRAL WAIVED |
2018-02-09 | Senate | FN4: ZERO(LWF) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(MVA) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | DP: BISHOP, GARDNER, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN |
2018-02-09 | Senate | CRA RPT 4DP |
2017-03-27 | Senate | CRA, L&C |
2017-03-27 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-03-24 | House | VERSION: CSHB 2(MLV) |
2017-03-24 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2017-03-24 | House | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2017-03-22 | House | WESTLAKE |
2017-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, GARA, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, CHENAULT, TARR, SADDLER, |
2017-03-22 | House | CHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2017-03-22 | House | PASSED Y39 E1 |
2017-03-22 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(MLV) |
2017-03-22 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2017-03-22 | House | MLV CS ADOPTED UC |
2017-03-22 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2017-03-22 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-13 | House | FN2: ZERO(MVA) |
2017-03-13 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2017-03-13 | House | DP: STUTES, WOOL, BIRCH, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO |
2017-03-13 | House | L&C RPT CS(MLV) NT 7DP |
2017-02-03 | House | FN2: ZERO(MVA) |
2017-02-03 | House | FN1: ZERO(LWF) |
2017-02-03 | House | DP: RAUSCHER, REINBOLD, LEDOUX, SADDLER, PARISH, TUCK |
2017-02-03 | House | MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 6DP |
2017-01-23 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PARISH |
2017-01-18 | House | MLV, L&C |
2017-01-18 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2017-01-18 | House | PREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17 |