AK HB2 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 12 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to a voluntary preference for members of the national guard and veterans by private employers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Priv Employer Voluntary Vet Preference

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-05-12SenateVERSION: CSHB 2(MLV)
2018-05-12SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-05-12SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2018-05-12SenateEGAN, COGHILL, BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER, WILSON, OLSON, VON IMHOF, KELLY
2018-05-12SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): COSTELLO, MICCICHE, SHOWER, BISHOP, STEVENS, HOFFMAN, HUGHES
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(MLV)
2018-05-12SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-05-12SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-05-12SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 5/12/2018
2018-05-11SenateL&C REFERRAL WAIVED
2018-02-09SenateFN4: ZERO(LWF)
2018-02-09SenateFN3: ZERO(MVA)
2018-02-09SenateDP: BISHOP, GARDNER, HOFFMAN, STEDMAN
2018-02-09SenateCRA RPT 4DP
2017-03-27SenateCRA, L&C
2017-03-27SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-03-24HouseVERSION: CSHB 2(MLV)
2017-03-24HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-03-24HouseRECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
2017-03-22HouseWESTLAKE
2017-03-22HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FANSLER, GARA, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, CHENAULT, TARR, SADDLER,
2017-03-22HouseCHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2017-03-22HousePASSED Y39 E1
2017-03-22HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 2(MLV)
2017-03-22HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-03-22HouseMLV CS ADOPTED UC
2017-03-22HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-03-22HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/22/2017
2017-03-13HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-03-13HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-03-13HouseDP: STUTES, WOOL, BIRCH, KNOPP, JOSEPHSON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO
2017-03-13HouseL&C RPT CS(MLV) NT 7DP
2017-02-03HouseFN2: ZERO(MVA)
2017-02-03HouseFN1: ZERO(LWF)
2017-02-03HouseDP: RAUSCHER, REINBOLD, LEDOUX, SADDLER, PARISH, TUCK
2017-02-03HouseMLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 6DP
2017-01-23HouseCOSPONSOR(S): PARISH
2017-01-18HouseMLV, L&C
2017-01-18HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-01-18HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/9/17

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback