AK HB197 | 2019-2020 | 31st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 25 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-25 - AWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act extending the Alaska Seismic Hazards Safety Commission; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Extend Seismic Hazards Safety Commission

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-18 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-25HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2020-03-25SenateVERSION: HB 197
2020-03-25SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2020-03-25SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-25SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2020-03-25SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 197
2020-03-25SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-03-25SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-25SenateRULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 3/25/2020
2020-03-24SenateFN1: (DNR)
2020-03-24SenateNR: WILSON, OLSON
2020-03-24SenateDP: STEDMAN, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, BISHOP
2020-03-24SenateFIN RPT 4DP 2NR
2020-03-19SenateFIN WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
2020-03-19SenateFIN
2020-03-19SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-03-18HouseVERSION: HB 197
2020-03-18HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2020-03-18HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2020-03-18HousePASSED Y34 N1 E4 A1
2020-03-18HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 197
2020-03-18HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2020-03-18HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2020-03-18HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2020
2020-03-11HouseFN1: (DNR)
2020-03-11HouseSULLIVAN-LEONARD, JOHNSTON, FOSTER
2020-03-11HouseDP: ORTIZ, CARPENTER, TILTON, LEBON, KNOPP, MERRICK, WOOL, JOSEPHSON,
2020-03-11HouseFIN RPT 11DP
2020-02-10HouseFN1: (DNR)
2020-02-10HouseNR: RAUSCHER
2020-02-10HouseDP: TUCK, HANNAN, TALERICO, HOPKINS, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR, LINCOLN
2020-02-10HouseRES RPT 7DP 1NR
2020-01-21HouseRES, FIN
2020-01-21HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2020-01-21HousePREFILE RELEASED 1/10/20

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback