AK HB197 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-04-26 - MANIFEST ERROR(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the duties of the commissioner of natural resources; relating to agriculture; relating to the noncommercial transfer of seed; and relating to community seed libraries.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Seed Libraries; Agriculture

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-26HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-04-20HouseAWAITING TRANSMITTAL TO GOV
2018-04-18SenateVERSION: CSHB 197(FIN)
2018-04-18SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-18SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-18SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 197(FIN)
2018-04-18SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-18SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-18SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2018
2018-04-17SenateFN2: ZERO(DNR)
2018-04-17SenateNR: WIELECHOWSKI, STEDMAN
2018-04-17SenateDP: GIESSEL, BISHOP, COGHILL, MEYER
2018-04-17SenateRES RPT 4DP 2NR
2018-04-10SenateRES
2018-04-10SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-04-09HouseVERSION: CSHB 197(FIN)
2018-04-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, MILLETT, KITO, JOSEPHSON, TILTON, WOOL, TUCK, TARR, PRUITT
2018-04-09HousePASSED Y37 N1 E2
2018-04-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 197(FIN)
2018-04-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-09HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2018
2018-04-04HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA, GUTTENBERG, KAWASAKI
2018-04-04HouseFN2: ZERO(DNR)
2018-04-04HouseAM: KAWASAKI
2018-04-04HouseNR: PRUITT, TILTON
2018-04-04HouseDP: GARA, WILSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-04-04HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 8DP 2NR 1AM
2017-05-03HouseFN1: ZERO(DNR)
2017-05-03HouseNR: PARISH, DRUMMOND, JOSEPHSON
2017-05-03HouseDP: BIRCH, TALERICO, WESTLAKE, JOHNSON, RAUSCHER, TARR
2017-05-03HouseRES RPT CS(RES) NT 6DP 3NR
2017-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KOPP
2017-03-31HouseCOSPONSOR(S): WILSON
2017-03-24HouseRES, FIN
2017-03-24HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback