AK HB192 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1-1)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act extending the termination date of the Alaska regional economic assistance program; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Ak Reg Econ Assist. Program; Extend
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 19 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Effective Date (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-11 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/10/21 |
2021-06-11 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/9 CHAPTER 5 SLA 21 |
2021-06-09 | House | 3:50 P.M. 6/8/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: HB 192 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N- E1 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 192 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-17 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-12 | Senate | DP: COSTELLO, MICCICHE, REVAK, STEVENS |
2021-05-12 | Senate | L&C RPT 4DP |
2021-05-07 | Senate | L&C |
2021-05-07 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-06 | House | VERSION: HB 192 |
2021-05-06 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-06 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PATKOTAK, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, JOSEPHSON, TUCK, TARR |
2021-05-06 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y39 E1 |
2021-05-06 | House | PASSED Y38 N1 E1 |
2021-05-06 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2021-05-06 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 192 |
2021-05-06 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-06 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N20 E1 |
2021-05-06 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-06 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/6/2021 |
2021-05-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND |
2021-05-04 | House | FN1: ZERO(CED) |
2021-05-04 | House | AM: MCCABE, PRAX, PATKOTAK |
2021-05-04 | House | DP: MCCARTY, DRUMMOND, HANNAN, SCHRAGE |
2021-05-04 | House | CRA RPT 4DP 3AM |
2021-05-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SCHRAGE, HANNAN |
2021-04-30 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS |
2021-04-28 | House | CRA |
2021-04-28 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |