AK HB19 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/8/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-12 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/8/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to special request registration plates; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Special Request License Plates
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Gatto [R] | Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Robert Lynn [R] | Sen. Bill Stoltze [R] |
Rep. Peggy Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 3/8/12 | |
2012-03-12 | SIGNED INTO LAW 3/7 CHAPTER 2 SLA 12 | |
2012-02-24 | 9:00 AM 2/24/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2012-02-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-17 | CC RPT ADPTD Y16 N1 E3 CCS HB 19 | |
2012-02-17 | CC REPORT TAKEN UP | |
2012-01-17 | CC REPORT READ AND HELD | |
2012-01-17 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2011-04-17 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y38 N2 | |
2011-04-17 | CC RPT ADPTD Y24 N16 CCS HB 19 | |
2011-04-17 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2011-04-17 | CC REPORT: CCS HB 19 | |
2011-04-17 | LIMITED POWERS FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED | |
2011-04-17 | MEYER (CHAIR), WIELECHOWSKI, MENARD | |
2011-04-17 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2011-04-17 | FAILED RECEDE (S) AM Y5 N15 | |
2011-04-17 | RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP | |
2011-04-16 | LYNN (CHAIR), SEATON, HOLMES | |
2011-04-16 | CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED | |
2011-04-16 | FAILED CONCUR (S) AM Y12 N28 | |
2011-04-15 | TAKE UP CONCUR WITHDRAWN | |
2011-04-14 | JT PRIME SPONSOR REMOVED: KELLER | |
2011-04-14 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2011-04-13 | VERSION: SCS HB 19(STA) | |
2011-04-13 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2011-04-13 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-04-13 | PASSED Y18 N2 | |
2011-04-13 | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 19(STA) | |
2011-04-13 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-13 | STA SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-04-13 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-04-13 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | TRA REFERRAL WAIVED | |
2011-04-12 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2011-04-12 | NR: PASKVAN, KOOKESH, MEYER, GIESSEL | |
2011-04-12 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI | |
2011-04-12 | STA RPT SCS 1DP 4NR SAME TITLE | |
2011-03-25 | STA, TRA | |
2011-03-25 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-04-07 | COSPONSOR(S): STOLTZE | |
2011-03-23 | VERSION: HB 19 | |
2011-03-23 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2011-03-23 | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP | |
2011-03-18 | RECONSIDERATION HELD TO 3/23 | |
2011-03-16 | STOLTZE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2011-03-16 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2011-03-16 | PASSED Y32 N3 E5 | |
2011-03-16 | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 19 | |
2011-03-16 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2011-03-16 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2011-03-16 | RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2011 | |
2011-02-25 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2011-02-25 | NR: COSTELLO | |
2011-02-25 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, NEUMAN, DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2011-02-25 | FIN RPT 8DP 1NR | |
2011-02-23 | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON | |
2011-02-09 | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON | |
2011-02-09 | FN1: ZERO(ADM) | |
2011-02-09 | DP: JOHANSEN, P.WILSON, KELLER, GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2011-02-09 | STA RPT 7DP | |
2011-01-18 | STA, FIN | |
2011-01-18 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2011-01-18 | PREFILE RELEASED 1/7/11 |
Subjects
Abortion
Adoption
Families
Flags
International Relations
Licensing
Medical Care
Military
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Religion
Trusts
Veterans
Weapons
Women
Adoption
Families
Flags
International Relations
Licensing
Medical Care
Military
Minors
Motor Vehicles
Religion
Trusts
Veterans
Weapons
Women