AK HB188 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-10)
Status: Passed on August 8 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-08 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing a program for financial accounts for individuals with disabilities; exempting the procurement of contracts for the program from the State Procurement Code; exempting certain information on participants in the program from being subject to inspection as a public record; providing that an account under the program for an individual with a disability is not a security; allowing a state to file a claim against an individual's financial account under the program to recover Medicaid payments after the individual's death; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Person W/disability Savings Accounts

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-16 - Senate - Senate: CSHB 188(FIN) Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-08-08HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
2016-08-08HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 8/6 CHAPTER 56 SLA 16
2016-07-15House4:21 PM 7/15/16 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2016-07-11HouseFN3: (REV)
2016-07-11HouseFN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 257
2016-07-11HouseLEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 6/28/16
2016-05-11HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2016-04-16SenateVERSION: CSHB 188(FIN)
2016-04-16SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2016-04-16SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-16SenatePASSED Y19 N- E1
2016-04-16SenateMICCICHE, BISHOP, EGAN, STEVENS, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, MEYER
2016-04-16SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, STOLTZE, ELLIS, GARDNER, MCGUIRE, WIELECHOWSKI
2016-04-16SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 188(FIN)
2016-04-16SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-16SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-16SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2016
2016-04-15SenateFN3: (REV)
2016-04-15SenateFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2016-04-15SenateNR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON, HOFFMAN
2016-04-15SenateDP: MACKINNON, MICCICHE, BISHOP
2016-04-15SenateFIN RPT 3DP 3NR
2016-04-11SenateFIN
2016-04-11SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2016-04-09HouseVERSION: CSHB 188(FIN)
2016-04-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2016-04-09HouseJOHNSON
2016-04-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): VAZQUEZ, TARR, JOSEPHSON, LYNN, DRUMMOND, TILTON, GATTIS, TUCK,
2016-04-09HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2016-04-09HousePASSED Y36 E4
2016-04-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 188(FIN)
2016-04-09HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2016-04-09HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2016-04-09HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2016-04-09HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2016
2016-04-08HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
2016-04-07HouseFN3: (REV)
2016-04-07HouseFN2: ZERO(DHS)
2016-04-07HouseNEUMAN, THOMPSON
2016-04-07HouseDP: SADDLER, KAWASAKI, GATTIS, PRUITT, WILSON, MUNOZ, GARA, GUTTENBERG, EDGMON,
2016-04-07HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 11DP
2016-03-21HouseFN1: (REV)
2016-03-21HouseAM: LEDOUX, JOSEPHSON
2016-03-21HouseNR: CHENAULT, TILTON
2016-03-21HouseDP: HUGHES, OLSON
2016-03-21HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 2NR 2AM
2016-03-10HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
2016-02-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HUGHES
2016-02-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GARA
2016-02-01HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2015-04-11HouseL&C, FIN
2015-04-11HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback