AK HB186 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the donation of food; and relating to food banks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Donations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 6/4/18
2018-03-07HouseSIGNED INTO LAW 3/6 CHAPTER 1 SLA 18
2018-03-05House1:00 PM 3/2/18 RETURNED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-12HouseBILL RECEIVED IN HOUSE AS PER REQUEST
2018-02-07House3:24 PM 2/7/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-02-05HouseMANIFEST ERROR(S)
2018-01-24SenateVERSION: HB 186
2018-01-24SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-01-24SenateMACKINNON, KELLY
2018-01-24SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): MEYER, EGAN, BEGICH, OLSON, HUGHES, BISHOP, COSTELLO
2018-01-24SenatePASSED Y18 N- E1 V1
2018-01-24SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 186
2018-01-24SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-01-24SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-01-24SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 1/24/2018
2018-01-24SenateFN2: ZERO(DEC)
2017-05-10SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, MICCICHE, GARDNER
2017-05-10SenateFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2017-05-10SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH, VON IMHOF, GIESSEL, MICCICHE
2017-05-10SenateHSS RPT 5DP
2017-04-15SenateHSS
2017-04-15SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2017-04-14HouseVERSION: HB 186
2017-04-14HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2017-04-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT, TILTON, JOSEPHSON, FANSLER, GARA
2017-04-14HousePASSED Y39 E1
2017-04-14HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME HB 186
2017-04-14HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2017-04-14HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2017-04-14HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2017
2017-04-05HouseCOSPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KOPP
2017-04-05HouseFN1: ZERO(DEC)
2017-04-05HouseDP: JOHNSTON, TARR, EDGMON, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, EASTMAN, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-04-05HouseHSS RPT 7DP
2017-04-03HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2017-03-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): EASTMAN
2017-03-17HouseHSS
2017-03-17HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback