AK HB186 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/25/10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act declaring that certain firearms and accessories are exempt from federal regulation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ak Firearms Exempt From Fed. Regulation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-07-09 EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/25/10
2010-07-09 SIGNED INTO LAW 5/27 CHAPTER 23 SLA 10
2010-07-09 2:27 PM 5/6/10 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2010-04-16 VERSION: CSHB 186(FIN) AM
2010-04-16 RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2010-04-16 PASSED Y18 N1 E1
2010-04-16 WIELECHOWSKI, MENARD, HUGGINS, STEVENS
2010-04-16 CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON, WAGONER, THOMAS, BUNDE, ELLIS, MCGUIRE, MEYER, EGAN
2010-04-16 READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 186(FIN) AM
2010-04-16 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
2010-04-16 READ THE SECOND TIME
2010-04-16 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2010
2010-04-14 FN3: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
2010-04-14 NR: OLSON
2010-04-14 DP: HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, EGAN, ELLIS
2010-04-14 FIN RPT 5DP 1NR
2010-02-26 FN3: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
2010-02-26 NR: FRENCH
2010-02-26 DP: COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI
2010-02-26 JUD RPT 2DP 1NR
2010-02-03 COSPONSOR(S): T.WILSON
2010-02-01 COSPONSOR(S): HARRIS
2009-04-17 JUD, FIN
2009-04-17 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2009-04-16 VERSION: CSHB 186(FIN) AM
2009-04-16 TRANSMITTED TO (S)
2009-04-16 COSPONSOR(S): NEUMAN
2009-04-16 PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N7 E1
2009-04-16 RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
2009-04-16 OLSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
2009-04-16 PASSED Y32 N7 E1
2009-04-16 AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
2009-04-16 AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y36 N2 E1 A1
2009-04-16 RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
2009-04-16 READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 186(FIN)
2009-04-15 COSPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM, JOHNSON, MILLETT
2009-04-15 ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/16 CALENDAR
2009-04-15 FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
2009-04-15 READ THE SECOND TIME
2009-04-15 RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2009
2009-04-13 FN2: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
2009-04-13 NR: THOMAS, GARA, CRAWFORD, SALMON, JOULE
2009-04-13 DP: KELLY, AUSTERMAN, FAIRCLOUGH, HAWKER, STOLTZE
2009-04-13 FIN RPT CS(FIN) 5DP 5NR
2009-04-11 COSPONSOR(S): AUSTERMAN, STOLTZE, HAWKER
2009-04-07 COSPONSOR(S): RAMRAS
2009-04-07 FN1: INDETERMINATE(LAW)
2009-04-07 NR: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
2009-04-07 DP: LYNN, COGHILL, GATTO, RAMRAS
2009-04-07 JUD RPT CS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
2009-04-06 COSPONSOR(S): LYNN, GATTO
2009-03-12 JUD, FIN
2009-03-12 READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback