AK HB180 | 2011-2012 | 27th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - FN4: (CC:HB284/ADM)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-30 - FN4: (CC:HB284/ADM)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of Administration to note a person's status as a retired veteran or a veteran discharged under honorable conditions on the person's driver's license or identification card, to provide certain information to the Department of Military and Veterans' Affairs, and to charge a fee for replacing a valid driver's license or identification card with a new license or card that includes the veteran designation; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Veteran Designation On Driver's License
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-30 | FN4: (CC:HB284/ADM) | |
2012-04-30 | FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 284 | |
2012-04-30 | LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 4/26/12 | |
2012-04-06 | REFERRED TO FINANCE | |
2012-04-06 | FN3: (ADM) | |
2012-04-06 | DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, MEYER, GIESSEL, PASKVAN | |
2012-04-06 | STA RPT SCS 5DP SAME TITLE | |
2012-03-28 | DAVIS, THOMAS, STEDMAN, KOOKESH, MCGUIRE, STEVENS | |
2012-03-28 | CROSS SPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI, DYSON, MEYER, ELLIS, MENARD, PASKVAN, EGAN, | |
2012-02-13 | STA, FIN | |
2012-02-13 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2012-02-10 | VERSION: CSHB 180(FIN) | |
2012-02-10 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2012-02-10 | COSPONSOR(S): MILLER, HOLMES, TUCK, JOHNSON, MILLETT, PRUITT, KAWASAKI | |
2012-02-10 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2012-02-10 | PASSED Y37 E3 | |
2012-02-10 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 180(FIN) | |
2012-02-10 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-10 | FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2012-02-10 | FN3: (ADM)(CORRECTED) | |
2012-02-10 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2012-02-10 | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2012 | |
2012-02-08 | COSPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, STOLTZE, THOMAS, KERTTULA | |
2012-02-08 | FN3: (ADM) | |
2012-02-08 | STOLTZE, THOMAS | |
2012-02-08 | DP: FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON, GUTTENBERG, GARA, JOULE, | |
2012-02-08 | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 10DP | |
2012-02-06 | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, COSTELLO | |
2012-01-27 | COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER | |
2011-08-24 | COSPONSOR(S): GARA, GRUENBERG | |
2011-04-01 | FN2: (ADM) | |
2011-04-01 | AM: JOHANSEN, P.WILSON | |
2011-04-01 | DP: GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, LYNN | |
2011-04-01 | STA RPT CS(STA) NT 4DP 2AM | |
2011-03-31 | COSPONSOR(S): PETERSEN | |
2011-03-18 | COSPONSOR(S): LYNN | |
2011-03-18 | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA | |
2011-03-18 | FN1: (ADM) | |
2011-03-18 | DNP: AUSTERMAN | |
2011-03-18 | DP: LYNN, GATTO, MILLER, SADDLER, THOMPSON | |
2011-03-18 | MLV RPT CS(MLV) NT 5DP 1DNP | |
2011-03-11 | COSPONSOR(S): FAIRCLOUGH | |
2011-03-09 | MLV, STA | |
2011-03-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |