AK HB177 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to an increase of an appropriation due to additional federal or other program receipts; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Revised Program: Appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-05-09 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 14 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-05-10 | Senate | FIN |
2022-05-10 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2022-05-09 | House | VERSION: CSHB 177(STA) |
2022-05-09 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2022-05-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TARR, JOSEPHSON |
2022-05-09 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-09 | House | PASSED Y36 N1 E3 |
2022-05-09 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 177(STA) |
2022-05-09 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-09 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N23 E3 |
2022-05-09 | House | STA CS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-09 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-09 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/9/2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | FN2: ZERO(GOV) |
2022-03-09 | House | NR: LEBON, WOOL, JOHNSON, MERRICK |
2022-03-09 | House | DP: EDGMON, ORTIZ, JOSEPHSON, FOSTER |
2022-03-09 | House | FIN RPT CS(STA) 4DP 4NR |
2021-05-19 | House | FN1: ZERO(GOV) |
2021-05-19 | House | DP: CLAMAN, VANCE, KAUFMAN, TARR, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-05-19 | House | STA RPT CS(STA) 5DP |
2021-04-16 | House | STA, FIN |
2021-04-16 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |