AK HB176 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to insurance; relating to direct health care agreements; and relating to unfair trade practices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Health Agreement: Not Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-25HouseFIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER HSS
2022-04-25HouseREFERRED TO HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
2022-04-25HouseFN2: INDETERMINATE(DHS/DOH)
2022-04-25HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2022-04-25HouseNR: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, SNYDER
2022-04-25HouseDP: NELSON, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
2022-04-25HouseL&C RPT CS(L&C) NEW TITLE 3DP 3NR
2022-04-20HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
2022-03-24HouseCOSPONSOR(S): NELSON
2021-04-16HouseL&C, HSS
2021-04-16HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback