AK HB176 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 30 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - DUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/6/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to medical assistance reimbursement for emergency medical transportation services; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emer. Medical Transport Service Payments

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseDUE BACK FROM GOVERNOR 7/6/18
2018-06-13House3:05 PM 6/13/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
2018-04-30SenateVERSION: CSHB 176(FIN)
2018-04-30SenateRETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
2018-04-30SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY, STEDMAN
2018-04-30SenateEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-04-30SenatePASSED Y20 N-
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 176(FIN)
2018-04-30SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
2018-04-30SenateREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-04-30SenateRULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2018
2018-04-23SenateFN4: (DHS)
2018-04-23SenateFN3: (DHS)
2018-04-23SenateDP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, STEVENS, OLSON, MICCICHE
2018-04-23SenateFIN RPT 6DP
2018-04-13SenateCROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON, MICCICHE, BISHOP
2018-03-29SenateFN4: (DHS)
2018-03-29SenateFN3: (DHS)
2018-03-29SenateNR: GIESSEL
2018-03-29SenateDP: WILSON, BEGICH
2018-03-29SenateHSS RPT 2DP 1NR
2018-03-12SenateHSS, FIN
2018-03-12SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2018-03-09HouseVERSION: CSHB 176(FIN)
2018-03-09HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2018-03-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): BIRCH, TUCK, JOSEPHSON, PARISH, RAUSCHER
2018-03-09HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2018-03-09HousePASSED Y30 E10
2018-03-09HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 176(FIN)
2018-03-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MILLETT
2018-03-07HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/9 CALENDAR
2018-03-07HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2018-03-07HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2018-03-07HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 3/7/2018
2018-03-02HouseFN4: (DHS)
2018-03-02HouseFN3: (DHS)
2018-03-02HouseNR: PRUITT
2018-03-02HouseDP: GARA, WILSON, KAWASAKI, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, GRENN, TILTON, SEATON, FOSTER
2018-03-02HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 9DP 1NR
2018-02-16HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, ORTIZ
2018-02-12HouseCOSPONSOR(S): GRENN
2018-02-07HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TALERICO, WILSON, THOMPSON
2018-02-05HouseBILL REPRINTED, ALL VERSIONS 2/5/18
2018-02-05HousePRIME SPONSOR: WOOL
2017-04-19HouseFN2: (DHS)
2017-04-19HouseFN1: (DHS)
2017-04-19HouseAM: EASTMAN
2017-04-19HouseNR: SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO
2017-04-19HouseDP: EDGMON, SPOHNHOLZ
2017-04-19HouseHSS RPT CS(HSS) NT 2DP 2NR 1AM
2017-03-14HouseHSS, FIN
2017-03-14HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback