AK HB176 | 2015-2016 | 29th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - RETURNED TO RLS
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-11 - RETURNED TO RLS
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing state employee salary schedule increases; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Repeal St Empl Salary Increase
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Senate:
2015-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Add a State Affairs Committee Referral? (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
CSHB 176(FIN) Rescind Previous Action?(Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Add a State Affairs Committee Referral? (Y: 5 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO RLS |
2015-06-11 | Senate | BEFORE SENATE IN THIRD READING CSHB 176(FIN) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RESCIND ACTION PASSING CSHB 176(FIN) Y19 N- E1 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | MOTION TO RESCIND ACTION IN PASSING CSHB 176(FIN) |
2015-06-11 | Senate | SECOND SPECIAL SESSION BILL: HCR 201 SUSPENDS UR 47 |
2015-06-11 | Senate | RETURN MESSAGE READ |
2015-06-11 | House | RETURNED TO SENATE PER REQUEST |
2015-06-11 | House | SECOND SPECIAL SESSION BILL, WAIVE RULE 47: HCR 201 |
2015-06-11 | House | SENATE MESSAGE REQUESTING RETURN OF BILL |
2015-04-19 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 176(FIN) |
2015-04-19 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2015-04-19 | Senate | RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP |
2015-04-18 | Senate | WIELECHOWSKI NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-04-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2015-04-18 | Senate | PASSED Y14 N6 |
2015-04-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 176(FIN) |
2015-04-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2015-04-18 | Senate | AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15 |
2015-04-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2015 |
2015-04-18 | Senate | FN3: (LEG/VARIOUS) |
2015-04-18 | Senate | FN2: (GOV/VARIOUS) |
2015-04-18 | Senate | FN1: (AJS/VARIOUS) |
2015-04-18 | Senate | AM: OLSON |
2015-04-18 | Senate | NR: MICCICHE, BISHOP |
2015-04-18 | Senate | DP: KELLY, MACKINNON, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN |
2015-04-18 | Senate | FIN RPT 4DP 2NR 1AM |
2015-04-17 | Senate | MOTION TO ADD STA REFERRAL FAILED Y5 N15 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | FIN |
2015-04-17 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2015-04-16 | House | VERSION: CSHB 176(FIN) |
2015-04-16 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2015-04-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y28 N12 |
2015-04-16 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y21 N19 |
2015-04-16 | House | RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-15 | House | MILLETT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2015-04-15 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y27 N13 |
2015-04-15 | House | PASSED Y21 N19 |
2015-04-15 | House | BEFORE HOUSE IN THIRD READING |
2015-04-15 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 176(FIN) |
2015-04-14 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR |
2015-04-14 | House | FIN CS ADOPTED UC |
2015-04-14 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2015-04-14 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | FN3: (LEG/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2015-04-13 | House | FN2: (GOV/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2015-04-13 | House | FN1: (AJS/VARIOUS DEPTS) |
2015-04-13 | House | NR: PRUITT, WILSON, GATTIS, EDGMON, MUNOZ, SADDLER |
2015-04-13 | House | DNP: GUTTENBERG, GARA |
2015-04-13 | House | DP: NEUMAN, THOMPSON |
2015-04-13 | House | FIN RPT CS(FIN) NT 2DP 2DNP 6NR |
2015-04-01 | House | FIN |
2015-04-01 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |