AK HB175 | 2009-2010 | 26th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 5 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to insurance, including treating as confidential certain information submitted to the director of insurance by the National Association of Insurance Commissioners; clarifying conditions for the release of insurer deposits; defining travel insurance that may be sold under a travel insurance limited producer license; exempting rewards under a wellness program from treatment as insurance discrimination or rebating; making certain insurance required of the Comprehensive Health Insurance Association permissive rather than mandatory; making certain provisions relating to statements on applications and guaranteed renewability for individual health insurance applicable to hospital and medical service corporations; making public certain forms and related documents filed for approval by a hospital or medical service corporation after the filing becomes effective; relating to deposits of self-funded multiple employer welfare arrangements; repealing reasons that the director of insurance may use to deny or revoke a license; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Insurance
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-05 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 7/1/09 | |
2009-08-05 | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 30 SLA 09 | |
2009-08-05 | 8:30 AM 6/12/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR | |
2009-08-05 | MANIFEST ERROR(S) | |
2009-04-19 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-19 | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y40 | |
2009-04-18 | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS | |
2009-04-18 | VERSION: CSHB 175(L&C) AM S | |
2009-04-18 | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED | |
2009-04-18 | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 10 | |
2009-04-18 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-18 | PASSED Y19 N- V1 | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 175(L&C) AM S | |
2009-04-18 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-18 | ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION | |
2009-04-18 | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-18 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-18 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/18/2009 | |
2009-04-17 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2009-04-17 | DP: PASKVAN, MEYER, THOMAS, DAVIS | |
2009-04-17 | L&C RPT 4DP | |
2009-04-16 | L&C | |
2009-04-16 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS | |
2009-04-15 | VERSION: CSHB 175(L&C) | |
2009-04-15 | TRANSMITTED TO (S) | |
2009-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-15 | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E1 A1 | |
2009-04-15 | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC | |
2009-04-15 | COGHILL NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION | |
2009-04-15 | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE | |
2009-04-15 | PASSED Y38 E1 A1 | |
2009-04-15 | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 175(L&C) | |
2009-04-14 | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/15 CALENDAR | |
2009-04-14 | L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT | |
2009-04-14 | READ THE SECOND TIME | |
2009-04-14 | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-11 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2009-04-11 | NR: AUSTERMAN, CRAWFORD, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON | |
2009-04-11 | DP: THOMAS, GARA, KELLY, HAWKER, STOLTZE | |
2009-04-11 | FIN RPT CS(L&C) NT 5DP 4NR | |
2009-04-01 | FN1: ZERO(CED) | |
2009-04-01 | NR: LYNN, BUCH, NEUMAN, CHENAULT, HOLMES | |
2009-04-01 | DP: COGHILL, OLSON | |
2009-04-01 | L&C RPT CS(L&C) NT 2DP 5NR | |
2009-03-09 | L&C, FIN | |
2009-03-09 | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Claims
Consumer Affairs
Disclosure
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Public Employees
Public Records
Retirement
Tourism
Consumer Affairs
Disclosure
Insurance
Licensing
Medical Care
Public Employees
Public Records
Retirement
Tourism