AK HB171 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-27 - COSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
Pending: House Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to pollutants; relating to perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances; relating to the duties of the Department of Environmental Conservation; relating to firefighting substances; relating to thermal remediation of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substance contamination; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Pfas Use & Remediation; Fire/water Safety

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-27HouseCOSPONSOR(S): HOPKINS
2022-02-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): TARR
2022-01-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): DRUMMOND
2021-04-28HouseCOSPONSOR(S): FIELDS
2021-04-12HouseREFERRED TO RESOURCES
2021-04-12HouseRES, FIN
2021-04-12HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback