AK HB168 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act requiring the Department of Health to provide and allow submission of an electronic application for certain state benefits; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Electronic Application For State Benefits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading Return to Second for Amendment No. 1 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-06-30 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 19 SLA 22 |
2022-06-17 | House | 12:10 P.M. 6/17/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-06-09 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-05-18 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 19 |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y38 A2 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR READ AND HELD |
2022-05-17 | Senate | VERSION: SCS HB 168(FIN) |
2022-05-17 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-17 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON |
2022-05-17 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS HB 168(FIN) |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/17 CAL |
2022-05-16 | Senate | FIN SCS ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-16 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-16 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/16/2022 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS/DOH) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | DP: HOFFMAN, WILSON, OLSON, VON IMHOF |
2022-05-12 | Senate | NR: STEDMAN |
2022-05-12 | Senate | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 19 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | FIN RPT SCS(FIN) 1NR 4DP NEW TITLE |
2022-02-04 | Senate | FN2: ZERO(DHS) |
2022-02-04 | Senate | NR: COSTELLO, HUGHES, REINBOLD |
2022-02-04 | Senate | DP: WILSON, BEGICH |
2022-02-04 | Senate | HSS RPT SCS(HSS) 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2021-04-30 | Senate | HSS, FIN |
2021-04-30 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-04-28 | House | VERSION: HB 168 |
2021-04-28 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-04-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KURKA, NELSON, TUCK |
2021-04-28 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-04-28 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-04-28 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2021-04-28 | House | AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN |
2021-04-28 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 Y22 N17 A1 |
2021-04-28 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 168 |
2021-04-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): VANCE, STORY |
2021-04-26 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/28 CALENDAR |
2021-04-26 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-04-26 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ |
2021-04-16 | House | FIN REFERRAL REMOVED |
2021-04-16 | House | FN1: ZERO(DHS) |
2021-04-16 | House | NR: KURKA |
2021-04-16 | House | DNP: PRAX |
2021-04-16 | House | DP: FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ, MCCARTY, SNYDER, ZULKOSKY |
2021-04-16 | House | HSS RPT 5DP 1DNP 1NR |
2021-04-09 | House | HSS, FIN |
2021-04-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |