AK HB167 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
Pending: House Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY
Pending: House Community & Regional Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to specie as legal tender in the state; and relating to borough and city sales and use taxes on specie.
Title
Gold And Silver Specie As Legal Tender
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MCCARTY |
2022-03-31 | House | COSPONSOR(S): NELSON |
2021-04-16 | House | COSPONSOR(S): PRAX |
2021-04-12 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TILTON |
2021-04-09 | House | REFERRED TO COMMUNITY & REGIONAL AFFAIRS |
2021-04-09 | House | CRA, STA, FIN |
2021-04-09 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Alaska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB167 |
Text | https://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0167A.PDF |