AK HB166 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

An Act relating to the issuance of vehicle registration plates; and providing for an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

One License Plate Per Vehicle

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-27 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Table (Y: 3 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Table (Y: 3 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 18 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 2 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-26 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 to Amendment No. 1 (Y: 1 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-05-05SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2022-05-05SenateFN2: (ADM)
2022-05-05SenateDP: MYERS, KIEHL, MICCICHE
2022-05-05SenateTRA RPT SCS(TRA) 3DP SAME TITLE
2022-04-29SenateTRA, FIN
2022-04-29SenateREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
2022-04-27HouseVERSION: CSHB 166(FIN)
2022-04-27HouseTRANSMITTED TO (S)
2022-04-27HouseEFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
2022-04-27HousePASSED Y29 N10 E1
2022-04-27HouseREAD THE THIRD TIME CSHB 166(FIN)
2022-04-26HouseCOSPONSOR(S): NELSON
2022-04-26HouseADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CAL
2022-04-26HouseAM NO 4 FAILED Y2 N35 E3
2022-04-26HouseMOTION TO TABLE FAILED Y3 N34 E3
2022-04-26HouseAM NO 3 FAILED Y18 N19 E3
2022-04-26HouseAM NO 2 FAILED Y4 N32 E3 A1
2022-04-26HouseAM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N35 E3
2022-04-26HouseCALL FOR THE QUESTION AM 1 UC
2022-04-26HouseAM 1 TO AM 1 FAILED Y1 N36 E3
2022-04-26HouseCALL FOR THE QUESTION UC
2022-04-26HouseAM 1 TO AM 1 OFFERED
2022-04-26HouseAM NO 1 OFFERED
2022-04-26HouseFIN CS ADOPTED UC
2022-04-26HouseREAD THE SECOND TIME
2022-04-26HouseRULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2022
2022-03-09HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
2022-03-09HouseFN2: (ADM)
2022-03-09HouseNR: ORTIZ, WOOL, MERRICK
2022-03-09HouseDNP: JOSEPHSON
2022-03-09HouseDP: LEBON, JOHNSON, EDGMON
2022-03-09HouseFIN RPT CS(FIN) NEW TITLE 3DP 1DNP 3NR
2021-05-15HouseCOSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, THOMPSON, CARPENTER, GILLHAM
2021-05-14HouseCOSPONSOR(S): LEBON
2021-04-28HouseFN1: (ADM)
2021-04-28HouseNR: CRONK, DRUMMOND, HOPKINS
2021-04-28HouseDNP: HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ
2021-04-28HouseDP: MCKAY, MCCABE
2021-04-28HouseTRA RPT 2DP 2DNP 3NR
2021-04-19HouseCOSPONSOR(S): MCKAY
2021-04-07HouseTRA, FIN
2021-04-07HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Bill/Detail/32?Root=HB166
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0166A.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0166B.PDF
Texthttp://www.akleg.gov/PDF/32/Bills/HB0166C.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB166&Page=02657#2657
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB166&Page=02658#AM2
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB166&Page=02659#AM3
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB166&Page=02660#AM4
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB166&Page=02657#AM1
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB166&Page=02659#2659
Roll Callhttp://www.akleg.gov/basis/Journal/Pages/32?Chamber=H&Bill=HB166&Page=02691#2691

Bill Comments

feedback