AK HB166 | 2017-2018 | 30th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-11-21 - COSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act establishing a museum construction grant program in the Department of Commerce, Community, and Economic Development.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Museum Construction Grant Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-21HouseCOSPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
2017-03-24HouseREFERRED TO FINANCE
2017-03-24HouseFN1: ZERO(CED)
2017-03-24HouseNR: SADDLER, TALERICO, RAUSCHER
2017-03-24HouseDP: WESTLAKE, DRUMMOND, PARISH, FANSLER
2017-03-24HouseCRA RPT 4DP 3NR
2017-03-13HouseCOSPONSOR(S): KITO
2017-03-08HouseCRA, FIN
2017-03-08HouseREAD THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS

Subjects


Alaska State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback