AK HB163 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3-1-1)
Status: Passed on October 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-05 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the issuance of vehicle registration plates; relating to vehicle title applications; relating to driver's license renewal; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Vehicle Title & Plates; Driver's Licenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Concur (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 3 (Y: 16 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-05 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2022-10-05 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 61 SLA 22 |
2022-10-05 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2022-10-05 | House | 2:00 P.M. 8/4/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-18 | House | TITLE CHANGE: SCR 30 |
2022-05-18 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y29 N10 E1 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR TAKEN UP UC |
2022-05-18 | House | LIMIT ALL INTROS TO 3 MIN, DEBATE TO 2 MIN EACH Y36 N4 |
2022-05-18 | House | CONCUR RECEIVED AND HELD |
2022-05-18 | Senate | VERSION: HB 163 AM S(EFD ADD S) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2022-05-18 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED Y19 N1 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 163 AM S(EFD ADD S) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 2 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-18 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2022-05-18 | Senate | FN3: ZERO(ADM) |
2022-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RULES TO FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL CALENDAR 5/18/2022 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | STA REFERRAL WAIVED |
2021-05-18 | Senate | STA |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-17 | House | VERSION: HB 163 |
2021-05-17 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-17 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON |
2021-05-17 | House | PASSED Y40 |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME HB 163 |
2021-05-17 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-17 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-17 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/17/2021 |
2021-05-14 | House | CLAMAN, KREISS-TOMKINS, LEBON |
2021-05-14 | House | COSPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN, ORTIZ, PRAX, MCKAY, THOMPSON, VANCE, MCCARTY, CRONK, |
2021-05-14 | House | FN2: ZERO(ADM) |
2021-05-14 | House | FOSTER |
2021-05-14 | House | DP: ORTIZ, LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, JOSEPHSON, JOHNSON, RASMUSSEN, MERRICK, |
2021-05-14 | House | FIN RPT 9DP |
2021-05-05 | House | FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER STA |
2021-05-05 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2021-05-05 | House | NR: EASTMAN, KAUFMAN, VANCE, TARR |
2021-05-05 | House | DP: CLAMAN, STORY, KREISS-TOMKINS |
2021-05-05 | House | STA RPT 3DP 4NR |
2021-04-16 | House | FN1: INDETERMINATE(ADM) |
2021-04-16 | House | DP: MCCABE, PRAX, MCCARTY, DRUMMOND, SCHRAGE, HANNAN |
2021-04-16 | House | CRA RPT 6DP |
2021-04-05 | House | CRA, STA |
2021-04-05 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |