AK HB162 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-05 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to tenure of public school teachers; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Teacher Tenure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Table - Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Table - Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Table - Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Table - Amendment No. 3 (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-04 - House - House: Second Reading Amendment No. 1 (Y: 9 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-04-05 | Senate | EDC |
2013-04-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2013-04-04 | House | VERSION: CSHB 162(EDC) AM |
2013-04-04 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2013-04-04 | House | PASSAGE OF BILL NOT IN ORDER MOTION WITHDRAWN |
2013-04-04 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y31 N7 E2 |
2013-04-04 | House | PASSED Y28 N10 E2 |
2013-04-04 | House | AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING |
2013-04-04 | House | AM NO 4 ADOPTED Y20 N15 E5 |
2013-04-04 | House | AM NO 3 TABLED Y28 N8 E4 |
2013-04-04 | House | AM NO 3 OFFERED |
2013-04-04 | House | AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y33 N3 E4 |
2013-04-04 | House | AM NO 1 FAILED Y9 N26 E4 A1 |
2013-04-04 | House | RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 & ALL AMS UC |
2013-04-04 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 162(EDC) |
2013-04-03 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/4 CALENDAR |
2013-04-03 | House | EDC CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2013-04-03 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2013-04-03 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/3/2013 |
2013-04-01 | House | COSPONSOR(S): GATTIS |
2013-03-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(EED) |
2013-03-28 | House | NR: LEDOUX, DRUMMOND, REINBOLD, SEATON |
2013-03-28 | House | DP: SADDLER, P.WILSON, GATTIS |
2013-03-28 | House | EDC RPT CS(EDC) 3DP 4NR |
2013-03-22 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE |
2013-03-11 | House | EDC |
2013-03-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
Subjects
Education
Employment
Labor Relations
Public Employees
Rights
Salaries & Allowances
School Districts
Teachers
Employment
Labor Relations
Public Employees
Rights
Salaries & Allowances
School Districts
Teachers