AK HB161 | 2013-2014 | 28th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 24 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-24 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to auctions or raffles for big game harvest permits and to the selection of nonprofit organizations to conduct auctions and raffles for the Department of Fish and Game.
Title
Auctions For Big Game Harvest Permits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-16 - House - House: Concur (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage Reconsideration (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/18/14 |
2014-06-24 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 47 SLA 14 |
2014-06-12 | House | 3:27 PM 6/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-16 | House | CONCUR AM OF (S) Y36 N1 E1 A2 |
2014-04-16 | House | CONSIDER CONCUR MESSAGE |
2014-04-15 | House | HELD UNDER UNFINISHED BUSINESS |
2014-04-15 | House | CONCUR MESSAGE READ |
2014-04-14 | Senate | VERSION: SCS CSHB 161(RES) AM S |
2014-04-14 | Senate | TRANSMITTED TO (H) AS AMENDED |
2014-04-14 | Senate | PASSED Y16 N4 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME SCS CSHB 161(RES) AM S |
2014-04-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RES SCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-04-14 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-04-14 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2014 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | NR: FRENCH, MICCICHE, DYSON |
2014-04-04 | Senate | DP: GIESSEL, MCGUIRE |
2014-04-04 | Senate | RES RPT SCS 2DP 3NR SAME TITLE |
2014-03-05 | Senate | RES |
2014-03-05 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2014-03-03 | House | VERSION: CSHB 161(RES) |
2014-03-03 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2014-03-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): REINBOLD |
2014-03-03 | House | PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y30 N5 E5 |
2014-03-03 | House | RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC |
2014-03-03 | House | GRUENBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION |
2014-03-03 | House | PASSED Y29 N6 E5 |
2014-03-03 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 161(RES) |
2014-02-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): FEIGE |
2014-02-28 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/3 CALENDAR |
2014-02-28 | House | RES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT |
2014-02-28 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2014-02-28 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 2/28/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | FN1: ZERO(DFG) |
2014-02-26 | House | DP: JOHNSON, OLSON, SEATON, SADDLER, FEIGE |
2014-02-26 | House | RES RPT CS(RES) 5DP |
2013-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR(S): TUCK |
2013-04-10 | House | COSPONSOR REMOVED: HIGGINS |
2013-04-09 | House | COSPONSOR(S): LEDOUX |
2013-04-04 | House | COSPONSOR(S): KELLER |
2013-04-03 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HIGGINS |
2013-03-29 | House | COSPONSOR(S): P.WILSON |
2013-03-28 | House | COSPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, MILLETT, HOLMES |
2013-03-26 | House | COSPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, COSTELLO |
2013-03-25 | House | COSPONSOR(S): HUGHES |
2013-03-11 | House | RES |
2013-03-11 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |