AK HB160 | 2021-2022 | 32nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An Act relating to the state procurement code; establishing the construction manager general contractor procurement method; and providing for an effective date.
Title
Procurement; Construction; Contracts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading - Final Passage Effective Date(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House: Third Reading Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER |
2021-08-16 | House | SIGNED INTO LAW 7/14 CHAPTER 22 SLA 21 |
2021-08-16 | House | 9:18 A.M. 7/9/21 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR |
2021-05-28 | House | MANIFEST ERROR(S) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | VERSION: CSHB 160(TRA) AM |
2021-05-19 | Senate | RETURN TO (H), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT |
2021-05-19 | Senate | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-19 | Senate | PASSED Y20 N- |
2021-05-19 | Senate | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 160(TRA) AM |
2021-05-18 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/19 CALENDAR |
2021-05-18 | Senate | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-18 | Senate | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2021 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2021-05-17 | Senate | NR: KIEHL |
2021-05-17 | Senate | DP: MYERS, MICCICHE |
2021-05-17 | Senate | TRA RPT 2DP 1NR |
2021-05-14 | Senate | TRA |
2021-05-14 | Senate | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |
2021-05-13 | House | VERSION: CSHB 160(TRA) AM |
2021-05-13 | House | TRANSMITTED TO (S) |
2021-05-13 | House | EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE |
2021-05-13 | House | PASSED Y39 A1 |
2021-05-13 | House | READ THE THIRD TIME CSHB 160(TRA) AM |
2021-05-13 | House | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC |
2021-05-13 | House | AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-13 | House | TRA CS ADOPTED UC |
2021-05-13 | House | READ THE SECOND TIME |
2021-05-13 | House | RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2021 |
2021-04-28 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2021-04-28 | House | NR: DRUMMOND, CRONK, HOPKINS |
2021-04-28 | House | DP: HANNAN, SPOHNHOLZ, MCKAY, MCCABE |
2021-04-28 | House | TRA RPT CS(TRA) 4DP 3NR |
2021-03-31 | House | GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER |
2021-03-31 | House | FN1: ZERO(DOT) |
2021-03-31 | House | TRA |
2021-03-31 | House | READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS |